|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 15/05/1924 | 12/08/1924 | 90 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 03/12/1927 | 17/02/1928 | 77 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 03/02/1932 | 08/03/1932 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 2426 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/05/1934 | 16/06/1934 | 25 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 29/07/1937 | 10/09/1937 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1940 | 11/04/1940 | 31 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1940 | 22/05/1940 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/07/1940 | 17/07/1940 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/06/1942 | 13/08/1942 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 2816 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/07/1944 | 18/08/1944 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 24163 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/08/1944 | 06/09/1944 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 18/03/1946 | 04/04/1946 | 18 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3439 |
||
Darlington Works | 17/12/1947 | 16/01/1948 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24153 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/08/1950 | 16/09/1950 | 37 days | General | Renumbered to BR 63439 |
||
Darlington Works | 18/09/1950 | 20/09/1950 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/05/1953 | 30/05/1953 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 24176 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1953 | 05/06/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/06/1953 | 20/06/1953 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/01/1955 | 16/03/1955 | 55 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 23/03/1955 | 07/04/1955 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/04/1955 | 28/04/1955 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/05/1955 | 03/06/1955 | 29 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 24198 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/12/1956 | 18/01/1957 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24304 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1959 | 08/07/1959 | 36 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1961 | 06/09/1961 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 24278 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/05/1963 | 24/05/1963 | 16 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/02/1948 | Darlington Works | On 7/2 new 'L.1's' up to No. 9006 were complete and painted in North Road yard, Nos. 9001/2 are Darlington 2020/1 of 1948. Nos. 9001-3 are painted green and lettered L.N.E.R., while 9004 and upwards have 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and the numbers on the bunkers; it is understood that they will be fitted with electric light and Westinghouse brakes. Nos. 9001/2 are at present working from Darlington on Saltburn turns. 'B.1' No. 1062 has been painted green and it is understood that 'B.1's' as they come in for shops will be dealt with in a similar manner. Locomotives awaiting Shops or scrapping during January included: 819, 958, 1881, 2111/2, 2361, 2713/8, 2939/41, 3124, 3252, 3339, 3404, 4756, 4860, 5030/44/98, 5639/45/46, 5769, 5804/31/49/78, 7266/74, 7608/43, 8308, 8402, 8725/27, 9379/86, 9422, 9775 an 9835, and Rail Cars Recovery and Hope. Locomotives ex Shops included: Nos. 1068, 1466, 2354/60/74/95, 3408/39/60, 5037, 5705/13/36/73, 7309/21, 7625/57, 8230/98, 8304, 8702/48, 9117, 9431, 9778/95/99, 9835/39/41/79/86/90. It is believed that the first two locomotives to be painted here with the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to have the number prefixed with an 'E' were Nos. E5696 and E5663, during W/E 31/1; all locomotives off North Road are now appearing in a similar manner. 'B.1's' Nos. 1273-6 have arrived at Bank Top shed, the first lot of a further ten to be allocated here; these will replace 'J.39's' which are going elsewhere | SLS/194803 |
04/07/1964 | Darlington Works (Waiting Works) | Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. | SLS/196408 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2282 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 30 Allocated to Neville Hill (NEV) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
15/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1924. Dep: 12/08/1924. | ||
03/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1927. Dep: 17/02/1928. | ||
03/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1932. Dep: 08/03/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2426 (Diagram 50) |
||
23/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1934. Dep: 16/06/1934. | ||
29/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1937. Dep: 10/09/1937. | ||
12/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1940. Dep: 11/04/1940. | ||
20/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/05/1940. Dep: 22/05/1940. | ||
04/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/07/1940. Dep: 17/07/1940. | ||
27/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1942. Dep: 13/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2816 (Diagram 50) |
||
14/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
18/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Consett (CON) | ||
12/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1944. Dep: 18/08/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24163 (Diagram 50A) |
||
23/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/08/1944. Dep: 06/09/1944. | ||
18/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/03/1946. Dep: 04/04/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3439 |
||
17/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1947. Dep: 16/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24153 (Diagram 50A) |
||
11/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1950. Dep: 16/09/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63439 |
||
18/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/09/1950. Dep: 20/09/1950. | ||
07/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1953. Dep: 30/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24176 (Diagram 50) |
||
03/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/06/1953. Dep: 05/06/1953. | ||
15/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/06/1953. Dep: 20/06/1953. | ||
21/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/01/1955. Dep: 16/03/1955. | ||
23/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/03/1955. Dep: 07/04/1955. | ||
15/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/04/1955. Dep: 28/04/1955. | ||
06/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 06/05/1955. Dep: 03/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24198 (Diagram 50) |
||
24/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1956. Dep: 18/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24304 (Diagram 50A) |
||
03/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 03/06/1959. Dep: 08/07/1959. | ||
09/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1961. Dep: 06/09/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24278 (Diagram 50A) |
||
09/05/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/05/1963. Dep: 24/05/1963. | ||
07/04/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63439 from Consett (52K) |