|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 09/01/1923 | 13/03/1923 | 64 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 12/11/1925 | 17/02/1926 | 98 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 21/02/1929 | 06/05/1929 | 75 days | General | Boiler number E4/23 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 22/06/1929 | 05/07/1929 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 04/08/1931 | 08/10/1931 | 66 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 10/05/1934 | 13/06/1934 | 35 days | General | Boiler number D845 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1938 | 05/05/1938 | 45 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 12/11/1940 | 05/12/1940 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2425 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1942 | 11/01/1943 | 31 days | General | Boiler number D1939 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1943 | 06/07/1943 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 13/07/1944 | 10/08/1944 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/02/1946 | 06/04/1946 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 2435 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3433 |
||
Darlington Works | 16/04/1947 | 26/04/1947 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 19/09/1947 | 02/10/1947 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1949 | 02/04/1949 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 2653 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63433 |
||
Darlington Works | 05/04/1949 | 14/04/1949 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/05/1951 | 09/06/1951 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24185 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/06/1951 | 12/06/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1951 | 13/07/1951 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 03/03/1953 | 01/04/1953 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 21/09/1954 | 18/10/1954 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 24295 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/12/1957 | 17/01/1958 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24313 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/01/1958 | 06/02/1958 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/06/1960 | 08/07/1960 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24190 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/07/1960 | 20/09/1960 | 61 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2276 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 24 Allocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
09/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1923. Dep: 13/03/1923. | ||
12/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1925. Dep: 17/02/1926. | ||
21/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1929. Dep: 06/05/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/23 (Diagram 50) |
||
22/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/06/1929. Dep: 05/07/1929. | ||
04/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Heavy) - Arr: 04/08/1931. Dep: 08/10/1931. | ||
10/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1934. Dep: 13/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D845 (Diagram 50) |
||
22/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1938. Dep: 05/05/1938. | ||
12/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1940. Dep: 05/12/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2425 (Diagram 50) |
||
05/05/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Consett (CON) | ||
12/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1942. Dep: 11/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1939 (Diagram 50) |
||
23/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/06/1943. Dep: 06/07/1943. | ||
13/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/07/1944. Dep: 10/08/1944. | ||
25/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1946. Dep: 06/04/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2435 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3433 |
||
16/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/04/1947. Dep: 26/04/1947. | ||
19/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/09/1947. Dep: 02/10/1947. | ||
12/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1949. Dep: 02/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2653 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63433 |
||
05/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/04/1949. Dep: 14/04/1949. | ||
10/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1951. Dep: 09/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24185 (Diagram 50) |
||
11/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/06/1951. Dep: 12/06/1951. | ||
09/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/07/1951. Dep: 13/07/1951. | ||
03/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/03/1953. Dep: 01/04/1953. | ||
21/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1954. Dep: 18/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24295 (Diagram 50A) |
||
16/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1957. Dep: 17/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24313 (Diagram 50A) |
||
31/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/01/1958. Dep: 06/02/1958. | ||
07/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1960. Dep: 08/07/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24190 (Diagram 50A) |
||
22/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/07/1960. Dep: 20/09/1960. | ||
08/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
30/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63433 from Sunderland (52G) |