|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 25/01/1923 | 16/04/1923 | 82 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 27/07/1925 | 16/10/1925 | 82 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/05/1928 | 13/07/1928 | 51 days | General | Boiler number D699 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/02/1931 | 26/03/1931 | 37 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/03/1934 | 11/04/1934 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 2565 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/03/1936 | 27/06/1936 | 110 days | General | Boiler number D806 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/01/1939 | 24/02/1939 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 3004 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/03/1941 | 03/04/1941 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 3161 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/04/1942 | 22/05/1942 | 33 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 01/09/1943 | 01/10/1943 | 31 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/10/1946 | 30/11/1946 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 3143 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/02/1948 | 20/02/1948 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/10/1948 | 19/11/1948 | 21 days | General | Boiler number 2985 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63431 |
||
Darlington Works | 24/04/1951 | 19/05/1951 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24271 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/12/1951 | 14/01/1952 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 23/01/1953 | 14/02/1953 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 24/06/1953 | 18/07/1953 | 25 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 04/08/1953 | 12/08/1953 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/08/1953 | 24/08/1953 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 12/12/1955 | 13/01/1956 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24277 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/09/1959 | 02/10/1959 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24150 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/03/1963 | 16/04/1963 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24201 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/05/1963 | 10/05/1963 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1963 | 21/05/1963 | 7 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
03/12/1966 | Allocation of Q6 class (Tyne Dock) | Tyne Dock: 63344/66/81/7, 63413/20/6/9/31/55/8; Sunderland: 63346/95, 63405/36/7; West Hartlepool: 63368/94/7, 63407/40/50. | SLS/196701 |
02/07/1967 | Eastern Region (North Eastern Section) steam stock (Tyne Dock) | Steam stock has been reduced to 124 as from 2nd July. The allocation of following classes is as under:- Q6 Sunderland: 63395. Tyne Dock: 63344/87, 63431. J27 Sunderland: 65795, 65811/55/79/82/92/94. K1 West Hartlepool: 62045. Tyne Dock: 62005/07/11/50/60. B1 Low Moor: 61030 Nyala, 61306/37. Jubilee Holbeck: 45562 Alberta, 45593 Kolhapur, 45697 Achilles. C1.5 Holbeck: 44826/28/52/96, 44912/43/83, 45080, 45219/73, 45428. Normanton: 44824/54/57, 44990, 45075. Low Moor: 44662/94, 45208. Of the 8F remaining on the N.E. Region, 4 are at Holbeck and 24 at Royston. The W.D. 2-8-0 are allocated to West Hartlepool (6), Sunderland (7), Normanton (14) and Low Moor (D; the 2-6-4Ts to Holbeck (4), Normanton (7), and Low Moor (5) and the C1.4 2-6-0s to West Hartlepool (D, North Blyth (4), Holbeck (2) and Normanton (3). There is still one steam locomotive in Departmental Stock J72 0-6-OT Deptl. 58 (ex 69005). | SLS/196708 |
13/08/1967 | West Hartlepool MPD | The following were on West Hartlepool on 13th August: 43015, 62026/41/2/4, 63344/87/94/7, 63407/31/5, 90061/74/6/116/210/30/54/309/39/47/60/434/59/78/92, 90627/77/95, D2068/77/8, D2153, D2205, D3137/9, D3672, D5152/65, D6756/63/6/9. | SLS/196709 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2274 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 22 Allocated to Stockton (SKN) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
25/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1923. Dep: 16/04/1923. | ||
27/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1925. Dep: 16/10/1925. | ||
24/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1928. Dep: 13/07/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D699 (Diagram 50) |
||
09/06/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
18/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1931. Dep: 26/03/1931. | ||
13/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1934. Dep: 11/04/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2565 (Diagram 50) |
||
10/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1936. Dep: 27/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D806 (Diagram 50) |
||
21/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1939. Dep: 24/02/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3004 (Diagram 50A) |
||
04/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1941. Dep: 03/04/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3161 (Diagram 50A) |
||
09/05/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
20/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/04/1942. Dep: 22/05/1942. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
19/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
01/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1943. Dep: 01/10/1943. | ||
20/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
08/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3431 | ||
25/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1946. Dep: 30/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3143 (Diagram 50A) |
||
13/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/02/1948. Dep: 20/02/1948. | ||
30/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1948. Dep: 19/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2985 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63431 |
||
05/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
11/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
12/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
18/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
04/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
10/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
20/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
26/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
24/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1951. Dep: 19/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24271 (Diagram 50A) |
||
18/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/12/1951. Dep: 14/01/1952. | ||
27/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
23/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/01/1953. Dep: 14/02/1953. | ||
24/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/06/1953. Dep: 18/07/1953. | ||
04/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/08/1953. Dep: 12/08/1953. | ||
17/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/08/1953. Dep: 24/08/1953. | ||
12/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1955. Dep: 13/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24277 (Diagram 50A) |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
03/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1959. Dep: 02/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24150 (Diagram 50A) |
||
24/02/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
18/03/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1963. Dep: 16/04/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24201 (Diagram 50A) |
||
02/05/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/05/1963. Dep: 10/05/1963. | ||
15/05/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/05/1963. Dep: 21/05/1963. | ||
02/07/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
07/08/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63431 from West Hartlepool (51C) |