|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 04/11/1924 | 27/01/1925 | 85 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 21/12/1926 | 16/03/1927 | 86 days | General | Boiler number E4/45 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/06/1929 | 13/08/1929 | 65 days | General | Boiler number E4/28 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1932 | 04/08/1932 | 43 days | General | Rail washing gear fitted Boiler number D1942 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1935 | 10/09/1935 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2149 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1938 | 30/09/1938 | 53 days | General | Boiler number AW19 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/06/1940 | 01/08/1940 | 39 days | General | Boiler number AW46 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/09/1942 | 13/10/1942 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 2638 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/10/1944 | 02/12/1944 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 2569 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/06/1946 | 09/08/1946 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 2817 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3430 |
||
Gateshead Works | 20/11/1947 | 16/12/1947 | 27 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1949 | 02/04/1949 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 2815 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63430 |
||
Darlington Works | 07/09/1951 | 28/09/1951 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 24200 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/03/1954 | 13/04/1954 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24259 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/02/1956 | 09/04/1956 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 24302 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/01/1958 | 06/01/1958 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Gateshead Works | 04/11/1958 | 19/12/1958 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 24292 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/11/1959 | 03/12/1959 | 9 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. | SLS/194905 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2273 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 21 Allocated to Selby (SEL) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
04/11/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1924. Dep: 27/01/1925. | ||
21/12/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1926. Dep: 16/03/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/45 (Diagram 50) |
||
10/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1929. Dep: 13/08/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/28 (Diagram 50) |
||
18/11/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
23/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1932. Dep: 04/08/1932. Work undertaken: Rail washing gear fitted Boiler number D1942 (Diagram 50) |
||
08/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1935. Dep: 10/09/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2149 (Diagram 50) |
||
21/05/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
09/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1938. Dep: 30/09/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number AW19 (Diagram 50) |
||
24/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1940. Dep: 01/08/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number AW46 (Diagram 50) |
||
16/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1942. Dep: 13/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2638 (Diagram 50) |
||
16/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1944. Dep: 02/12/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2569 (Diagram 50) |
||
26/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1946. Dep: 09/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2817 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3430 |
||
20/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/11/1947. Dep: 16/12/1947. | ||
05/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
11/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
11/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1949. Dep: 02/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2815 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63430 |
||
13/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
19/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
07/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1951. Dep: 28/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24200 (Diagram 50) |
||
18/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1954. Dep: 13/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24259 (Diagram 50) |
||
16/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1956. Dep: 09/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24302 (Diagram 50A) |
||
06/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 06/01/1958. Dep: 06/01/1958. | ||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
04/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1958. Dep: 19/12/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24292 (Diagram 50A) |
||
25/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/11/1959. Dep: 03/12/1959. | ||
29/04/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63430 from Thornaby (51L) |