|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 06/11/1922 | 30/01/1923 | 86 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 18/06/1925 | 25/09/1925 | 100 days | General | Boiler number D239 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/05/1928 | 18/07/1928 | 57 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 18/02/1930 | 31/03/1930 | 42 days | General | Boiler number HL987 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/05/1930 | 21/06/1930 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 22/01/1936 | 07/04/1936 | 77 days | General | Boiler number 2565 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/07/1939 | 06/09/1939 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3017 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1939 | 13/09/1939 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/08/1941 | 23/09/1941 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 3009 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/09/1943 | 14/10/1943 | 43 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 31/01/1946 | 19/02/1946 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 02/07/1947 | 30/08/1947 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 2394 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 13/12/1948 | 29/12/1948 | 17 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63429 |
||
Darlington Works | 19/05/1949 | 13/07/1949 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 3161 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 18/02/1950 | 03/03/1950 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 07/08/1951 | 31/08/1951 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24189 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/09/1952 | 13/09/1952 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 28/11/1953 | 31/12/1953 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 24166 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 23/04/1956 | 25/05/1956 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24253 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/06/1959 | 07/08/1959 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 24213 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/08/1959 | 27/08/1959 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/09/1959 | 10/09/1959 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/02/1961 | 09/03/1961 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 28/08/1963 | 04/10/1963 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 24236 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/10/1963 | 25/10/1963 | 15 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
03/12/1966 | Allocation of Q6 class (Tyne Dock) | Tyne Dock: 63344/66/81/7, 63413/20/6/9/31/55/8; Sunderland: 63346/95, 63405/36/7; West Hartlepool: 63368/94/7, 63407/40/50. | SLS/196701 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2272 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 20 Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
06/11/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1922. Dep: 30/01/1923. | ||
18/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1925. Dep: 25/09/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number D239 (Diagram 50) |
||
23/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1928. Dep: 18/07/1928. | ||
18/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1930. Dep: 31/03/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL987 (Diagram 50) |
||
21/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/05/1930. Dep: 21/06/1930. | ||
08/02/1933 | Modification | Diagram 50 number D670 boiler fitted | ||
22/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1936. Dep: 07/04/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2565 (Diagram 50) |
||
26/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1939. Dep: 06/09/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3017 (Diagram 50A) |
||
29/07/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
06/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/09/1939. Dep: 13/09/1939. | ||
15/02/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
25/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1941. Dep: 23/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3009 (Diagram 50A) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
02/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1943. Dep: 14/10/1943. | ||
12/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
31/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/01/1946. Dep: 19/02/1946. | ||
25/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3429 | ||
02/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1947. Dep: 30/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2394 (Diagram 50) |
||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
13/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/12/1948. Dep: 29/12/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63429 |
||
19/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1949. Dep: 13/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3161 (Diagram 50A) |
||
18/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/02/1950. Dep: 03/03/1950. | ||
07/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1951. Dep: 31/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24189 (Diagram 50A) |
||
02/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/09/1952. Dep: 13/09/1952. | ||
28/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1953. Dep: 31/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24166 (Diagram 50) |
||
23/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1956. Dep: 25/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24253 (Diagram 50) |
||
22/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1959. Dep: 07/08/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24213 (Diagram 50A) |
||
17/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/08/1959. Dep: 27/08/1959. | ||
01/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/09/1959. Dep: 10/09/1959. | ||
13/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
01/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/02/1961. Dep: 09/03/1961. | ||
19/03/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
24/02/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
28/08/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1963. Dep: 04/10/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24236 (Diagram 50A) |
||
11/10/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/10/1963. Dep: 25/10/1963. | ||
09/01/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
01/07/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63429 from Tyne Dock (52H) |