|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 09/02/1923 | 20/04/1923 | 71 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 24/03/1927 | 17/06/1927 | 86 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 16/05/1930 | 04/07/1930 | 50 days | General | Boiler number E4/5 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/04/1934 | 15/05/1934 | 27 days | General | Boiler number HL982 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/12/1936 | 28/01/1937 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2388 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/09/1939 | 11/10/1939 | 37 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/04/1942 | 29/04/1942 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2434 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/02/1943 | 22/02/1943 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/01/1945 | 22/02/1945 | 43 days | General | Boiler number HL105 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/08/1947 | 12/09/1947 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 3009 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/05/1950 | 15/06/1950 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 3311 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63424 |
||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1950 | 26/06/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/11/1953 | 19/12/1953 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 24205 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/12/1953 | 24/12/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 12/11/1956 | 07/12/1956 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24190 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/01/1957 | 30/01/1957 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/05/1958 | 16/06/1958 | 39 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 03/02/1960 | 23/02/1960 | 21 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/03/1960 | 11/05/1960 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 24285 (Diagram 50A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2267 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 15 Allocated to Blaydon (BLA) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
09/02/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1923. Dep: 20/04/1923. | ||
02/03/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
24/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1927. Dep: 17/06/1927. | ||
16/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1930. Dep: 04/07/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/5 (Diagram 50) |
||
19/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1934. Dep: 15/05/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL982 (Diagram 50) |
||
18/04/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
17/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1936. Dep: 28/01/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2388 (Diagram 50) |
||
14/12/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
05/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1939. Dep: 11/10/1939. | ||
01/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1942. Dep: 29/04/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2434 (Diagram 50) |
||
11/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/02/1943. Dep: 22/02/1943. | ||
26/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
11/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1945. Dep: 22/02/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL105 (Diagram 50) |
||
05/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
15/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3424 | ||
06/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1947. Dep: 12/09/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3009 (Diagram 50A) |
||
03/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1950. Dep: 15/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3311 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63424 |
||
23/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/06/1950. Dep: 26/06/1950. | ||
27/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1953. Dep: 19/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24205 (Diagram 50A) |
||
21/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/12/1953. Dep: 24/12/1953. | ||
14/08/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
12/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1956. Dep: 07/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24190 (Diagram 50A) |
||
14/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/01/1957. Dep: 30/01/1957. | ||
09/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/05/1958. Dep: 16/06/1958. | ||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
03/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/02/1960. Dep: 23/02/1960. | ||
31/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1960. Dep: 11/05/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24285 (Diagram 50A) |
||
11/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) | ||
13/01/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63424 from Neville Hill (55H) |