|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 14/12/1922 | 08/03/1923 | 85 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 05/01/1924 | 10/01/1924 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 18/02/1927 | 10/06/1927 | 113 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 09/06/1928 | 20/06/1928 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 04/01/1929 | 22/01/1929 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 14/11/1929 | 22/01/1930 | 70 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 29/04/1931 | 06/05/1931 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/09/1932 | 10/10/1932 | 20 days | Heavy | Boiler number 46 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1934 | 10/10/1934 | 64 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 21/04/1937 | 07/06/1937 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 2386 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/05/1940 | 15/06/1940 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 3145 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/09/1942 | 09/10/1942 | 35 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/06/1944 | 01/07/1944 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3023 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 07/11/1945 | 22/11/1945 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 07/02/1947 | 19/04/1947 | 72 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 04/02/1949 | 11/03/1949 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 24187 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63417 |
||
Darlington Works | 05/04/1951 | 27/04/1951 | 23 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 02/05/1951 | 07/05/1951 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 20/06/1951 | 30/08/1951 | 72 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 20/04/1953 | 09/05/1953 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 24181 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/01/1955 | 18/01/1955 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1955 | 30/06/1955 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 24284 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 02/12/1957 | 03/01/1958 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24169 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/11/1959 | 11/11/1959 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 14/01/1960 | 20/01/1960 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1960 | 04/07/1960 | 46 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 03/07/1961 | 18/08/1961 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 24153 (Diagram 50A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. | SLS/194905 |
09/07/1961 | Darlington Works (Stripping Shop Yard) | Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2260 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 8 Allocated to Blaydon (BLA) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
14/12/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1922. Dep: 08/03/1923. | ||
05/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/01/1924. Dep: 10/01/1924. | ||
18/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1927. Dep: 10/06/1927. | ||
09/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/06/1928. Dep: 20/06/1928. | ||
04/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/01/1929. Dep: 22/01/1929. | ||
14/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1929. Dep: 22/01/1930. | ||
29/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/04/1931. Dep: 06/05/1931. | ||
07/11/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
26/11/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
21/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 21/09/1932. Dep: 10/10/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 46 (Diagram 50) |
||
08/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1934. Dep: 10/10/1934. | ||
21/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1937. Dep: 07/06/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2386 (Diagram 50) |
||
21/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1940. Dep: 15/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3145 (Diagram 50A) |
||
05/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1942. Dep: 09/10/1942. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
10/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1944. Dep: 01/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3023 (Diagram 50A) |
||
07/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/11/1945. Dep: 22/11/1945. | ||
15/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3417 | ||
07/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1947. Dep: 19/04/1947. | ||
07/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
13/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
04/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1949. Dep: 11/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24187 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63417 |
||
05/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/04/1951. Dep: 27/04/1951. | ||
02/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/05/1951. Dep: 07/05/1951. | ||
20/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/06/1951. Dep: 30/08/1951. | ||
20/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1953. Dep: 09/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24181 (Diagram 50A) |
||
11/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/01/1955. Dep: 18/01/1955. | ||
03/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1955. Dep: 30/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24284 (Diagram 50A) |
||
02/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1957. Dep: 03/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24169 (Diagram 50A) |
||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
09/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/11/1959. Dep: 11/11/1959. | ||
14/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/01/1960. Dep: 20/01/1960. | ||
20/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/05/1960. Dep: 04/07/1960. | ||
03/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1961. Dep: 18/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24153 (Diagram 50A) |
||
16/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) | ||
13/02/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63417 from Neville Hill (55H) |