|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 23/08/1923 | 22/10/1923 | 61 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 02/12/1927 | 12/03/1928 | 102 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 03/02/1930 | 02/04/1930 | 59 days | Heavy | |||
Gateshead Works | 27/08/1931 | 30/09/1931 | 35 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/10/1934 | 15/11/1934 | 32 days | General | Boiler number AW27 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/08/1937 | 22/01/1938 | 150 days | General | Boiler number 2658 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/01/1938 | 07/02/1938 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1940 | 04/08/1940 | 28 days | General | Boiler number HL104 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/07/1941 | 15/07/1941 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/07/1941 | 31/07/1941 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 28/10/1942 | 26/11/1942 | 30 days | General | Boiler number D1940 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 30/06/1944 | 13/07/1944 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 27/09/1945 | 03/11/1945 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 3314 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 08/10/1946 | 23/10/1946 | 16 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3415 |
||
Darlington Works | 13/04/1948 | 14/05/1948 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 3147 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63415 |
||
Darlington Works | 15/01/1951 | 08/02/1951 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24173 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/04/1953 | 24/04/1953 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 27/04/1954 | 29/05/1954 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24260 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 02/06/1954 | 10/06/1954 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 29/06/1954 | 31/07/1954 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 06/03/1957 | 28/03/1957 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 24293 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/08/1960 | 06/10/1960 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 24317 (Diagram 50A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/07/1964 | Darlington Works (Waiting Works) | Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. | SLS/196408 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2258 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 6 Allocated to Blaydon (BLA) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
23/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1923. Dep: 22/10/1923. | ||
02/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1927. Dep: 12/03/1928. | ||
03/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Heavy) - Arr: 03/02/1930. Dep: 02/04/1930. | ||
27/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1931. Dep: 30/09/1931. | ||
15/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1934. Dep: 15/11/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number AW27 (Diagram 50) |
||
26/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1937. Dep: 22/01/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2658 (Diagram 50) |
||
24/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/01/1938. Dep: 07/02/1938. | ||
08/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1940. Dep: 04/08/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL104 (Diagram 50) |
||
14/05/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
03/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/07/1941. Dep: 15/07/1941. | ||
17/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/07/1941. Dep: 31/07/1941. | ||
14/09/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northallerton (NLN) | ||
28/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1942. Dep: 26/11/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1940 (Diagram 50) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
30/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/06/1944. Dep: 13/07/1944. | ||
27/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1945. Dep: 03/11/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3314 (Diagram 50A) |
||
08/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/10/1946. Dep: 23/10/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3415 |
||
13/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1948. Dep: 14/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3147 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63415 |
||
27/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
15/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1951. Dep: 08/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24173 (Diagram 50) |
||
24/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/04/1953. Dep: 24/04/1953. | ||
27/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1954. Dep: 29/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24260 (Diagram 50A) |
||
02/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/06/1954. Dep: 10/06/1954. | ||
29/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/06/1954. Dep: 31/07/1954. | ||
06/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1957. Dep: 28/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24293 (Diagram 50A) |
||
31/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1960. Dep: 06/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24317 (Diagram 50A) |
||
15/04/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63415 from West Hartlepool (51C) |