|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 1922 | 26/07/1922 | General | ||||
Gateshead Works | 20/02/1925 | 29/05/1925 | 99 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 14/01/1926 | 12/02/1926 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 09/06/1926 | 09/07/1926 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 12/07/1927 | 25/10/1927 | 106 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 19/02/1930 | 27/03/1930 | 37 days | General | Boiler number HL986 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 19/03/1931 | 27/03/1931 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/07/1933 | 22/08/1933 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1935 | 22/11/1935 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 2440 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/08/1938 | 06/12/1938 | 103 days | General | Boiler number 24246 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/12/1938 | 19/12/1938 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/02/1941 | 21/03/1941 | 35 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/09/1941 | 28/10/1941 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 3017 (Diagram 50AQ) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/04/1943 | 10/06/1943 | 59 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1945 | 06/07/1945 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24151 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/11/1945 | 21/12/1945 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/09/1947 | 23/10/1947 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3297 (Diagram 50Ai) |
||
Gateshead Works | 31/05/1950 | 03/07/1950 | 34 days | Light Intermediate | After derailment Renumbered to BR 63414 |
||
Darlington Works | 17/11/1952 | 06/12/1952 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 24243 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/12/1952 | 16/12/1952 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/12/1952 | 22/12/1952 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/02/1956 | 20/03/1956 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24271 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/03/1956 | 06/04/1956 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/09/1959 | 03/10/1959 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 24321 (Diagram 50A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1920 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2257 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 5 Allocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: ?/1922. Dep: 26/07/1922. | ||
20/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1925. Dep: 29/05/1925. | ||
14/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/01/1926. Dep: 12/02/1926. | ||
09/06/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/06/1926. Dep: 09/07/1926. | ||
12/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1927. Dep: 25/10/1927. | ||
19/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1930. Dep: 27/03/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL986 (Diagram 50) |
||
19/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/03/1931. Dep: 27/03/1931. | ||
10/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1933. Dep: 22/08/1933. | ||
08/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1935. Dep: 22/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2440 (Diagram 50) |
||
26/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1938. Dep: 06/12/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24246 (Diagram 50A) |
||
07/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/12/1938. Dep: 19/12/1938. | ||
30/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
07/05/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
15/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/02/1941. Dep: 21/03/1941. | ||
22/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1941. Dep: 28/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3017 (Diagram 50AQ) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
13/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1943. Dep: 10/06/1943. | ||
14/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
24/08/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
06/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1945. Dep: 06/07/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24151 (Diagram 50) |
||
27/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/11/1945. Dep: 21/12/1945. | ||
25/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3414 | ||
04/05/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
25/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1947. Dep: 23/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3297 (Diagram 50Ai) |
||
31/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 31/05/1950. Dep: 03/07/1950. Work undertaken: After derailment Renumbered to BR 63414 |
||
17/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1952. Dep: 06/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24243 (Diagram 50A) |
||
09/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/12/1952. Dep: 16/12/1952. | ||
18/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/12/1952. Dep: 22/12/1952. | ||
23/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1956. Dep: 20/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24271 (Diagram 50A) |
||
26/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/03/1956. Dep: 06/04/1956. | ||
05/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1959. Dep: 03/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24321 (Diagram 50A) |
||
17/05/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63414 from West Hartlepool (51C) |