|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 24/05/1923 | 19/07/1923 | 57 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 29/07/1926 | 26/10/1926 | 90 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 07/11/1928 | 22/12/1928 | 46 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 19/08/1931 | 06/10/1931 | 49 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/05/1934 | 27/06/1934 | 29 days | General | Boiler number AW44 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/04/1937 | 25/05/1937 | 36 days | General | Boiler number AW34 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/05/1940 | 25/05/1940 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 2570 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/05/1940 | 30/05/1940 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/07/1941 | 24/07/1941 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1942 | 24/06/1942 | 45 days | General | Boiler number HL103 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/08/1944 | 24/08/1944 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2430 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/03/1947 | 26/04/1947 | 52 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/07/1950 | 05/09/1950 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 24152 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63412 |
||
Darlington Works | 04/03/1953 | 11/04/1953 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 27/06/1956 | 12/09/1956 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 24279 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/01/1962 | 03/03/1962 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 24265 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/12/1963 | 16/01/1964 | 39 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 24167 (Diagram 50A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/02/1962 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D14/7/8/24/6, D3071/4, D4087-92, D5108/48/73-5, 12120, 60807/35/7, 60931, 61035, 61274, 63438/64/70/2, 65892, 67742, 80117, 90310, 90677/95, 92202, Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 82027, Stripping Shop: 46407, 65751, 80116. Outside Stripping Shop: 46460, 61039, 61383, 67753, 68064, 68672. Works Yard: D281, D2173, D2589, 43016/53/5/71, 60954/9/77/81, 63412, 65099, 65794, 65889, 67609, 68010/43, 80119. 90603. Crossing: D257/78/80, D2247, D4086, D5107/49. Scrap Road: 61201, 61368, 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50/1/60, 64979, 65741/69, 65839, 67707/22/7/39/50/75, 68063, 68674/80/88/9/98, 68703/29/34. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1919 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2255 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 3 Allocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
24/05/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1923. Dep: 19/07/1923. | ||
24/12/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
29/07/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1926. Dep: 26/10/1926. | ||
07/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1928. Dep: 22/12/1928. | ||
27/11/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
04/12/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
19/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1931. Dep: 06/10/1931. | ||
30/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1934. Dep: 27/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number AW44 (Diagram 50) |
||
20/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1937. Dep: 25/05/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number AW34 (Diagram 50) |
||
01/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1940. Dep: 25/05/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2570 (Diagram 50) |
||
28/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/05/1940. Dep: 30/05/1940. | ||
14/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/07/1941. Dep: 24/07/1941. | ||
11/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1942. Dep: 24/06/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL103 (Diagram 50) |
||
01/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1944. Dep: 24/08/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2430 (Diagram 50) |
||
15/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3412 | ||
06/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1947. Dep: 26/04/1947. | ||
20/07/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
13/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1950. Dep: 05/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24152 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63412 |
||
04/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/03/1953. Dep: 11/04/1953. | ||
27/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1956. Dep: 12/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24279 (Diagram 50A) |
||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (51G) | ||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
29/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1962. Dep: 03/03/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24265 (Diagram 50A) |
||
09/12/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 09/12/1963. Dep: 16/01/1964. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24167 (Diagram 50A) |
||
11/07/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63412 from West Hartlepool (51C) |