|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 1922 | 27/07/1922 | General | ||||
Gateshead Works | 01/12/1924 | 18/02/1925 | 80 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 23/11/1926 | 24/02/1927 | 94 days | General | Boiler number D225 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 16/05/1929 | 31/07/1929 | 77 days | General | Boiler number 2259 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 10/06/1932 | 18/07/1932 | 39 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1935 | 21/11/1935 | 45 days | General | Boiler number HL108 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/01/1936 | 05/03/1936 | 52 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 29/04/1936 | 16/07/1936 | 79 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 31/03/1939 | 16/05/1939 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 2430 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/11/1941 | 26/12/1941 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2152 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/08/1944 | 07/09/1944 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 2826 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 02/01/1946 | 16/01/1946 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 26/11/1946 | 28/12/1946 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 2816 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/02/1949 | 21/03/1949 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 24196 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63411 |
||
Darlington Works | 31/03/1949 | 12/04/1949 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/06/1949 | 09/07/1949 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/07/1949 | 12/07/1949 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/06/1951 | 30/06/1951 | 19 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 05/07/1951 | 09/07/1951 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 30/12/1952 | 29/01/1953 | 31 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1953 | 20/06/1953 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24292 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/07/1953 | 22/07/1953 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 11/10/1955 | 10/11/1955 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 02/05/1957 | 07/06/1957 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 29/09/1958 | 30/10/1958 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24270 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/12/1959 | 15/12/1959 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/04/1962 | 04/05/1962 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24279 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/05/1962 | 23/05/1962 | 8 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). | SLS/194904 |
31/03/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. | SLS/194905 |
30/04/1949 | Darlington Works | New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84. Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460. |
SLS/194906 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1919 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2254 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 2 Allocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: ?/1922. Dep: 27/07/1922. | ||
01/12/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1924. Dep: 18/02/1925. | ||
23/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1926. Dep: 24/02/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number D225 (Diagram 50) |
||
16/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1929. Dep: 31/07/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2259 (Diagram 50) |
||
10/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1932. Dep: 18/07/1932. | ||
08/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1935. Dep: 21/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL108 (Diagram 50) |
||
14/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/01/1936. Dep: 05/03/1936. | ||
29/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 29/04/1936. Dep: 16/07/1936. | ||
29/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
31/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1939. Dep: 16/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2430 (Diagram 50) |
||
16/10/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
01/04/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
18/05/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
26/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1941. Dep: 26/12/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2152 (Diagram 50) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
19/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
17/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1944. Dep: 07/09/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2826 (Diagram 50) |
||
18/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
02/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/01/1946. Dep: 16/01/1946. | ||
15/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3411 | ||
26/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1946. Dep: 28/12/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2816 (Diagram 50) |
||
07/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
13/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
28/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1949. Dep: 21/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24196 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63411 |
||
31/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/03/1949. Dep: 12/04/1949. | ||
29/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/06/1949. Dep: 09/07/1949. | ||
11/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/07/1949. Dep: 12/07/1949. | ||
12/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/06/1951. Dep: 30/06/1951. | ||
05/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/07/1951. Dep: 09/07/1951. | ||
30/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/12/1952. Dep: 29/01/1953. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
25/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1953. Dep: 20/06/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24292 (Diagram 50A) |
||
22/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 22/07/1953. Dep: 22/07/1953. | ||
11/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/10/1955. Dep: 10/11/1955. | ||
02/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/05/1957. Dep: 07/06/1957. | ||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
29/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1958. Dep: 30/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24270 (Diagram 50A) |
||
09/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/12/1959. Dep: 15/12/1959. | ||
02/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1962. Dep: 04/05/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24279 (Diagram 50A) |
||
16/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/05/1962. Dep: 23/05/1962. | ||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
06/04/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63411 from Tyne Dock (52H) |