|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 19/10/1923 | 08/01/1924 | 82 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/03/1925 | 18/08/1925 | 147 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/09/1925 | 27/10/1925 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/06/1928 | 30/08/1928 | 67 days | General | Boiler number D916 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/03/1931 | 29/04/1931 | 48 days | General | Boiler number E4/12 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/03/1934 | 17/04/1934 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 2388 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1936 | 04/12/1936 | 60 days | General | Boiler number D1940 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/12/1939 | 09/03/1940 | 73 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 29/09/1942 | 29/10/1942 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 3314 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/09/1945 | 11/10/1945 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 3335 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 10/08/1946 | 23/08/1946 | 14 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3408 |
||
Darlington Works | 11/12/1947 | 09/01/1948 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 3311 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/04/1950 | 11/05/1950 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2989 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63408 |
||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1950 | 27/12/1950 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 01/10/1952 | 25/10/1952 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24240 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 15/10/1954 | 03/12/1954 | 50 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 04/08/1955 | 10/09/1955 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 24213 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 07/10/1955 | 04/11/1955 | 29 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 09/05/1957 | 03/07/1957 | 56 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 08/04/1959 | 07/05/1959 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24191 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/09/1961 | 21/09/1961 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/04/1963 | 24/04/1963 | 1 day | Weighing |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/02/1948 | Darlington Works | On 7/2 new 'L.1's' up to No. 9006 were complete and painted in North Road yard, Nos. 9001/2 are Darlington 2020/1 of 1948. Nos. 9001-3 are painted green and lettered L.N.E.R., while 9004 and upwards have 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and the numbers on the bunkers; it is understood that they will be fitted with electric light and Westinghouse brakes. Nos. 9001/2 are at present working from Darlington on Saltburn turns. 'B.1' No. 1062 has been painted green and it is understood that 'B.1's' as they come in for shops will be dealt with in a similar manner. Locomotives awaiting Shops or scrapping during January included: 819, 958, 1881, 2111/2, 2361, 2713/8, 2939/41, 3124, 3252, 3339, 3404, 4756, 4860, 5030/44/98, 5639/45/46, 5769, 5804/31/49/78, 7266/74, 7608/43, 8308, 8402, 8725/27, 9379/86, 9422, 9775 an 9835, and Rail Cars Recovery and Hope. Locomotives ex Shops included: Nos. 1068, 1466, 2354/60/74/95, 3408/39/60, 5037, 5705/13/36/73, 7309/21, 7625/57, 8230/98, 8304, 8702/48, 9117, 9431, 9778/95/99, 9835/39/41/79/86/90. It is believed that the first two locomotives to be painted here with the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to have the number prefixed with an 'E' were Nos. E5696 and E5663, during W/E 31/1; all locomotives off North Road are now appearing in a similar manner. 'B.1's' Nos. 1273-6 have arrived at Bank Top shed, the first lot of a further ten to be allocated here; these will replace 'J.39's' which are going elsewhere | SLS/194803 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1919 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2251 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Selby (SEL) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
19/10/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1923. Dep: 08/01/1924. | ||
25/03/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1925. Dep: 18/08/1925. | ||
28/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/09/1925. Dep: 27/10/1925. | ||
25/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1928. Dep: 30/08/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D916 (Diagram 50) |
||
18/11/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
13/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1931. Dep: 29/04/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/12 (Diagram 50) |
||
16/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1934. Dep: 17/04/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2388 (Diagram 50) |
||
06/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1936. Dep: 04/12/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1940 (Diagram 50) |
||
28/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1939. Dep: 09/03/1940. | ||
29/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1942. Dep: 29/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3314 (Diagram 50A) |
||
20/03/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD) | ||
14/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1945. Dep: 11/10/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3335 (Diagram 50A) |
||
10/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/08/1946. Dep: 23/08/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3408 |
||
29/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
11/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1947. Dep: 09/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3311 (Diagram 50A) |
||
18/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1950. Dep: 11/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2989 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63408 |
||
12/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/12/1950. Dep: 27/12/1950. | ||
27/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
01/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1952. Dep: 25/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24240 (Diagram 50A) |
||
14/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
15/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/10/1954. Dep: 03/12/1954. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
04/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1955. Dep: 10/09/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24213 (Diagram 50A) |
||
07/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/10/1955. Dep: 04/11/1955. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
09/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/05/1957. Dep: 03/07/1957. | ||
08/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1959. Dep: 07/05/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24191 (Diagram 50A) |
||
12/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/09/1961. Dep: 21/09/1961. | ||
24/02/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
24/04/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 24/04/1963. Dep: 24/04/1963. | ||
02/07/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63408 from Tyne Dock (52H) |