|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 04/04/1924 | 28/06/1924 | 86 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/07/1927 | 28/10/1927 | 108 days | General | Boiler number D619 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/01/1930 | 15/02/1930 | 38 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/06/1932 | 18/07/1932 | 40 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/01/1936 | 15/04/1936 | 92 days | General | Boiler number D671 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/07/1939 | 09/08/1939 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2813 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/01/1940 | 12/03/1940 | 69 days | General | Boiler number 2818 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/01/1941 | 30/01/1941 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/01/1942 | 17/02/1942 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 2875 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/07/1942 | 06/08/1942 | 28 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/06/1944 | 29/06/1944 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3138 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/12/1946 | 08/02/1947 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 24230 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 31/10/1948 | 16/11/1948 | 17 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63406 |
||
Darlington Works | 29/06/1949 | 10/08/1949 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 2888 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/08/1949 | 18/08/1949 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/01/1952 | 16/02/1952 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 24215 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/02/1952 | 20/02/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 06/03/1952 | 26/03/1952 | 21 days | Light Casual | After derailment |
||
Darlington Works | 23/03/1953 | 18/04/1953 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 21/07/1954 | 13/08/1954 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 24261 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/02/1957 | 01/03/1957 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 24205 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/03/1957 | 07/03/1957 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/03/1957 | 21/03/1957 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/02/1960 | 10/03/1960 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24187 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/11/1961 | 16/12/1961 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24274 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/12/1961 | 03/01/1962 | 14 days | Unclassified | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 19/01/1962 | 06/02/1962 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1963 | 02/09/1963 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/02/1964 | 03/02/1964 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1964 | 20/05/1964 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 23/03/1965 | 23/03/1965 | 1 day | Weighing |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1919 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2249 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
04/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1924. Dep: 28/06/1924. | ||
13/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1927. Dep: 28/10/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number D619 (Diagram 50) |
||
09/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1930. Dep: 15/02/1930. | ||
09/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1932. Dep: 18/07/1932. | ||
15/12/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
02/10/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
07/12/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
15/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1936. Dep: 15/04/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D671 (Diagram 50) |
||
28/06/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
05/05/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
27/05/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
26/11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
01/07/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
05/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1939. Dep: 09/08/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2813 (Diagram 50) |
||
07/10/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
04/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1940. Dep: 12/03/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2818 (Diagram 50) |
||
25/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/01/1941. Dep: 30/01/1941. | ||
21/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1942. Dep: 17/02/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2875 (Diagram 50) |
||
10/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/07/1942. Dep: 06/08/1942. | ||
08/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1944. Dep: 29/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3138 (Diagram 50A) |
||
27/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3406 | ||
13/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1946. Dep: 08/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24230 (Diagram 50) |
||
31/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/10/1948. Dep: 16/11/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63406 |
||
29/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1949. Dep: 10/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2888 (Diagram 50) |
||
15/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/08/1949. Dep: 18/08/1949. | ||
25/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1952. Dep: 16/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24215 (Diagram 50) |
||
18/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/02/1952. Dep: 20/02/1952. | ||
06/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/03/1952. Dep: 26/03/1952. Work undertaken: After derailment |
||
23/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/03/1953. Dep: 18/04/1953. | ||
21/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1954. Dep: 13/08/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24261 (Diagram 50A) |
||
12/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1957. Dep: 01/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24205 (Diagram 50A) |
||
04/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/03/1957. Dep: 07/03/1957. | ||
14/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/03/1957. Dep: 21/03/1957. | ||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B) | ||
18/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Consett (52K) | ||
08/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1960. Dep: 10/03/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24187 (Diagram 50A) |
||
20/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1961. Dep: 16/12/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24274 (Diagram 50A) |
||
21/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/12/1961. Dep: 03/01/1962. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
19/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/01/1962. Dep: 06/02/1962. | ||
12/08/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/08/1963. Dep: 02/09/1963. | ||
08/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
03/02/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 03/02/1964. Dep: 03/02/1964. | ||
20/05/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 20/05/1964. Dep: 20/05/1964. | ||
23/03/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 23/03/1965. Dep: 23/03/1965. | ||
31/07/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63406 from Sunderland (52G) |