|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 11/06/1924 | 29/08/1924 | 80 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1927 | 29/10/1927 | 81 days | General | Boiler number D658 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/02/1930 | 27/03/1930 | 45 days | General | Boiler number HL985 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/05/1930 | 17/06/1930 | 33 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 20/12/1932 | 20/01/1933 | 32 days | General | In store at Paint Shop Boiler number D833 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/01/1937 | 15/02/1937 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2261 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/05/1940 | 06/06/1940 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 24176 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/09/1942 | 17/10/1942 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24268 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 04/07/1944 | 03/08/1944 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/06/1946 | 10/08/1946 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 24223 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3403 |
||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1949 | 12/08/1949 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 24268 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63403 |
||
Darlington Works | 13/11/1951 | 07/12/1951 | 25 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 30/12/1954 | 22/01/1955 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 24276 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/01/1955 | 28/01/1955 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/12/1957 | 25/01/1958 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24198 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/01/1958 | 29/01/1958 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1960 | 20/01/1960 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 04/12/1961 | 04/01/1962 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24325 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/07/1962 | 30/07/1962 | 1 day | Weighing |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1919 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2246 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
11/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1924. Dep: 29/08/1924. | ||
10/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1927. Dep: 29/10/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number D658 (Diagram 50) |
||
11/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1930. Dep: 27/03/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL985 (Diagram 50) |
||
16/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/05/1930. Dep: 17/06/1930. | ||
20/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1932. Dep: 20/01/1933. Work undertaken: In store at Paint Shop Boiler number D833 (Diagram 50) |
||
18/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1937. Dep: 15/02/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2261 (Diagram 50) |
||
14/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1940. Dep: 06/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24176 (Diagram 50) |
||
18/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1942. Dep: 17/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24268 (Diagram 50A) |
||
13/05/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD) | ||
04/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/07/1944. Dep: 03/08/1944. | ||
25/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1946. Dep: 10/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24223 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3403 |
||
29/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
20/07/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
08/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1949. Dep: 12/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24268 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR 63403 |
||
13/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/11/1951. Dep: 07/12/1951. | ||
30/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1954. Dep: 22/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24276 (Diagram 50A) |
||
24/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/01/1955. Dep: 28/01/1955. | ||
01/07/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
29/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (51B) | ||
31/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1957. Dep: 25/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24198 (Diagram 50) |
||
27/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/01/1958. Dep: 29/01/1958. | ||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
26/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
08/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/01/1960. Dep: 20/01/1960. | ||
04/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1961. Dep: 04/01/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24325 (Diagram 50A) |
||
30/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 30/07/1962. Dep: 30/07/1962. | ||
24/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
27/07/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63403 from West Hartlepool (51C) |