|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 29/09/1923 | 14/12/1923 | 77 days | General | Boiler number D656 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/01/1924 | 17/01/1924 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 19/03/1924 | 04/04/1924 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 16/05/1927 | 24/08/1927 | 101 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 31/12/1929 | 12/02/1930 | 44 days | General | Boiler number D670 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1932 | 18/01/1933 | 38 days | General | In store at paint shop Boiler number 2433 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/10/1936 | 28/11/1936 | 45 days | General | Boiler number AW26 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/11/1937 | 31/01/1938 | 77 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 04/05/1939 | 04/08/1939 | 93 days | General | Boiler number HL108 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/10/1941 | 27/10/1941 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1943 | 08/02/1943 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2857 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 02/06/1944 | 21/06/1944 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1945 | 24/11/1945 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 2565 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 21/03/1947 | 03/04/1947 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 12/09/1947 | 22/10/1947 | 41 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 18/09/1948 | 15/10/1948 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 2434 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63398 |
||
Gateshead Works | 25/09/1950 | 02/11/1950 | 39 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 07/04/1951 | 02/05/1951 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24183 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 01/07/1953 | 19/08/1953 | 50 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 15/04/1954 | 29/04/1954 | 15 days | Light Casual | Afer collision |
||
Darlington Works | 15/11/1954 | 08/12/1954 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 24233 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/04/1956 | 11/05/1956 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 14/10/1957 | 27/11/1957 | 45 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1958 | 27/01/1958 | 5 days | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 06/03/1959 | 08/04/1959 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 24163 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/04/1959 | 13/05/1959 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/07/1961 | 12/07/1961 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 04/12/1962 | 04/01/1963 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24251 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1965 | 12/08/1965 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/11/1948 | Darlington Works | The new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60130-33, ex North Road bear Works Nos. 2049-52, in order. A minor change will be noticed in the new Darlington and Doncaster Works plates on the new 'A.1's,' they give the date, Works No. and origin, but no area is given. No. 68051 has been fitted with a modified bunker (and new cab windows), for increased coal capacity. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 827, 1601/29/30/42/51/55/72, 2992 (to scrap yard), 3007, 3344, 4916, 5710, 7307, 8089, 8400, 8686, 9099, 9392, 69841, 'Austerity' 77329 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60507, 60980. 62366, 62711/23/75, 63398, 65028, 65118, 65752/85, 65803/83, 67256/65, 68051, 68395, 68437, 68533, 68675, 69372/92, 69787, 69882/91/93 and- 'Austerity' 77215. Locomotives broken up:-Nos. 1360/78, 5641, 8285, 8400 an 9399. It will be noticed that two of these were ex G.C.R. 'B.7' 4-6-0's. It is pleasing to note that the N.E. Area locomotives. especially Gateshead stock, are approaching their pre-grouping splendour for cleanliness. Some of the 'A.4's' are spotless, while the rest are creditable. |
SLS/194812 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1918 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2241 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
29/09/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1923. Dep: 14/12/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number D656 (Diagram 50) |
||
04/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/01/1924. Dep: 17/01/1924. | ||
19/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/03/1924. Dep: 04/04/1924. | ||
16/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1927. Dep: 24/08/1927. | ||
31/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1929. Dep: 12/02/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number D670 (Diagram 50) |
||
12/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1932. Dep: 18/01/1933. Work undertaken: In store at paint shop Boiler number 2433 (Diagram 50) |
||
15/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1936. Dep: 28/11/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number AW26 (Diagram 50) |
||
16/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 16/11/1937. Dep: 31/01/1938. | ||
04/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1939. Dep: 04/08/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL108 (Diagram 50) |
||
10/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/10/1941. Dep: 27/10/1941. | ||
08/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1943. Dep: 08/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2857 (Diagram 50) |
||
18/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
13/05/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
02/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/06/1944. Dep: 21/06/1944. | ||
06/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1945. Dep: 24/11/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2565 (Diagram 50) |
||
20/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3398 | ||
21/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/03/1947. Dep: 03/04/1947. | ||
20/07/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
12/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/09/1947. Dep: 22/10/1947. | ||
18/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1948. Dep: 15/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2434 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63398 |
||
25/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/09/1950. Dep: 02/11/1950. | ||
07/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1951. Dep: 02/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24183 (Diagram 50) |
||
01/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/07/1953. Dep: 19/08/1953. | ||
15/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/04/1954. Dep: 29/04/1954. Work undertaken: Afer collision |
||
15/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1954. Dep: 08/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24233 (Diagram 50) |
||
27/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/04/1956. Dep: 11/05/1956. | ||
01/07/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
29/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (51B) | ||
14/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/10/1957. Dep: 27/11/1957. | ||
23/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 23/01/1958. Dep: 27/01/1958. | ||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
06/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1959. Dep: 08/04/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24163 (Diagram 50A) |
||
24/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/04/1959. Dep: 13/05/1959. | ||
12/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 12/07/1961. Dep: 12/07/1961. | ||
04/12/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1962. Dep: 04/01/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24251 (Diagram 50A) |
||
02/02/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
21/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
12/08/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 12/08/1965. Dep: 12/08/1965. | ||
11/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63398 from Tyne Dock (52H) |