|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 28/03/1923 | 15/06/1923 | 80 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/12/1925 | 31/03/1926 | 107 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/10/1928 | 30/11/1928 | 38 days | General | Boiler number D817 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1931 | 29/06/1931 | 41 days | General | Boiler number D1165 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/10/1933 | 05/12/1933 | 37 days | General | Boiler number HL983 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/01/1937 | 17/02/1937 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2874 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/09/1938 | 06/10/1938 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/03/1941 | 16/04/1941 | 45 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 31/03/1943 | 03/05/1943 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 2262 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/01/1945 | 08/02/1945 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/12/1945 | 24/01/1946 | 48 days | General | Boiler number HL110 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 01/04/1947 | 16/04/1947 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 28/01/1948 | 27/02/1948 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24163 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR E3396 |
||
Darlington Works | 10/10/1950 | 18/11/1950 | 40 days | General | Renumbered to BR 63396 |
||
Darlington Works | 20/11/1950 | 22/11/1950 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/05/1953 | 30/05/1953 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 24203 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1953 | 06/06/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1954 | 16/07/1954 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 14/03/1956 | 16/04/1956 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 24226 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/04/1959 | 20/05/1959 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 24208 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/09/1959 | 02/10/1959 | 12 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/09/1947 | WD | The Italian State Railways have commenced renumbering the W.D. and U.S.A. locomotives they took over in 1946. Three classes have so far had new numbers allocated to them. The W.D. 2-8-2 Nos. 71016/28/37/8/40/83/4/5/7/9/95/7/8/1100/6/9/10/3/4/9/20/46/8/51/7/66/7/89/91/3, are to become 747.001 to 747.030. No. 71027 taken over in 1946 has apparently been withdrawn. The USA. 2-8-0 Nos. 1650/75/93/6, 1711/6/8/32/4/7/40/1/7/52/3/61/5/7/74/5/82, 1783/5/99, 1851/2/7/8/60/5/6/8/70, 2059/60/6/7/8/9/70/8/9/80/1, 2736-50, 2766-75, 3275-8, 3283-3320, 3322-6, 3328/9/32/4/5/6/7/9/42/8/50, 3380-96, 3405-8, 3411-28, 3430, 3562/8/9/70/1/2, 3611/7/8/9/22/3/40/1, 3660-71, 3685-99, 4418/21/37, 5701/2/31/5/6, 5740-58, 5760/1, 5825/9/34, 5835/44/5, are to become 736.001 to 736.243. Of these up to No. 2081 saw previous service in Algeria and Tunisia. The rest were shipped direct from the U.S.A. to Naples. No. 4418 was noted as Alco. 73410 of 1945. U.S.A. 0-6-OT Nos. 1927/9/30/1 are to become 831.001 to 831.004. No. 1928 has been withdrawn or sold. No mention has yet been made of the renumbering of the Stanier 2-8-0, but it seems more than likely that they will become Nos. 737.001 to 737.015. | SLS/194711 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1918 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2239 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
28/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1923. Dep: 15/06/1923. | ||
15/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1925. Dep: 31/03/1926. | ||
24/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1928. Dep: 30/11/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D817 (Diagram 50) |
||
20/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1931. Dep: 29/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1165 (Diagram 50) |
||
30/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1933. Dep: 05/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL983 (Diagram 50) |
||
18/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1937. Dep: 17/02/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2874 (Diagram 50) |
||
17/02/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to East Hartlepool (EHL) | ||
26/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/09/1938. Dep: 06/10/1938. | ||
17/04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
23/05/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
03/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1941. Dep: 16/04/1941. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
31/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1943. Dep: 03/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2262 (Diagram 50) |
||
21/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
20/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
19/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/01/1945. Dep: 08/02/1945. | ||
08/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1945. Dep: 24/01/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL110 (Diagram 50) |
||
20/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3396 | ||
01/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/04/1947. Dep: 16/04/1947. | ||
28/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1948. Dep: 27/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24163 (Diagram 50A) Renumbered to BR E3396 |
||
01/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
07/08/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
10/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1950. Dep: 18/11/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63396 |
||
20/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/11/1950. Dep: 22/11/1950. | ||
12/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1953. Dep: 30/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24203 (Diagram 50) |
||
03/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/06/1953. Dep: 06/06/1953. | ||
08/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/07/1954. Dep: 16/07/1954. | ||
14/08/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
14/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1956. Dep: 16/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24226 (Diagram 50A) |
||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
22/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1959. Dep: 20/05/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24208 (Diagram 50A) |
||
21/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/09/1959. Dep: 02/10/1959. | ||
29/04/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63396 from Thornaby (51L) |