|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 1922 | 12/1922 | General | ||||
Gateshead Works | 12/06/1925 | 25/09/1925 | 106 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 11/05/1928 | 10/07/1928 | 61 days | General | Boiler number E4/48 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 18/03/1932 | 26/04/1932 | 40 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 03/08/1933 | 08/09/1933 | 37 days | General | Boiler number D918 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1937 | 23/06/1937 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2385 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/11/1940 | 19/12/1940 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2433 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/02/1941 | 23/04/1941 | 59 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/12/1942 | 24/12/1942 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2561 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 27/07/1944 | 19/08/1944 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1944 | 30/12/1944 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 20/11/1945 | 15/12/1945 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 2426 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 07/03/1947 | 15/03/1947 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1948 | 11/06/1948 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 2388 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63389 |
||
Darlington Works | 15/06/1948 | 24/06/1948 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/12/1950 | 20/01/1951 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 24164 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/01/1951 | 23/01/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/11/1953 | 28/11/1953 | 23 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 30/11/1953 | 02/12/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/12/1953 | 07/12/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/07/1955 | 14/07/1955 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 02/12/1955 | 08/02/1956 | 69 days | General | Boiler number 24272 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/12/1958 | 21/01/1959 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 24273 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/11/1959 | 21/11/1959 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/06/1962 | 13/07/1962 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 24239 (Diagram 50A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/07/1962 | Darlington MPD (Ex Works) | Stored: 43070 (51L), 43101 (51L), 65768, 65772, 65773, 69002 (51A), 78015 (51J). Ex Works: 43014 (50A), 43125 (50B), 60834 (62B), 60944 (52B), 60973 (63A), 62004 (51A), 63389 (51L), 68043 (51A), 90011 (51A), 90273 (51L), 90430 (51A), 92098 (52H). Awaiting Works: 42639 (50F), 43134 (66D), 46494 (31A), 60818 (64A), 64706 (52G), 64713, 64730 (51L), 64757 (51L), 64758 (51L), 64821 (51L), 64835 (51F), 64848 (51F), 64982 (51F), 65670, 65761, 65776. Visitors : D12 (55H), 42553 (50A), 60040 (52A). | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1917 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2232 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: ?/1922. Dep: ?/12/1922. | ||
12/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1925. Dep: 25/09/1925. | ||
11/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1928. Dep: 10/07/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/48 (Diagram 50) |
||
18/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/03/1932. Dep: 26/04/1932. | ||
03/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1933. Dep: 08/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D918 (Diagram 50) |
||
11/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1937. Dep: 23/06/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2385 (Diagram 50) |
||
24/06/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annfield Plain (AFP) | ||
09/09/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Consett (CON) | ||
19/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1940. Dep: 19/12/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2433 (Diagram 50) |
||
24/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/02/1941. Dep: 23/04/1941. | ||
02/05/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
01/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1942. Dep: 24/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2561 (Diagram 50) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
04/12/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
27/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/07/1944. Dep: 19/08/1944. | ||
06/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/12/1944. Dep: 30/12/1944. | ||
20/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1945. Dep: 15/12/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2426 (Diagram 50) |
||
15/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3389 | ||
07/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/03/1947. Dep: 15/03/1947. | ||
13/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
20/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1948. Dep: 11/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2388 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63389 |
||
15/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/06/1948. Dep: 24/06/1948. | ||
29/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1950. Dep: 20/01/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24164 (Diagram 50A) |
||
22/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/01/1951. Dep: 23/01/1951. | ||
06/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/11/1953. Dep: 28/11/1953. | ||
30/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/11/1953. Dep: 02/12/1953. | ||
04/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/12/1953. Dep: 07/12/1953. | ||
11/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/07/1955. Dep: 14/07/1955. | ||
02/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1955. Dep: 08/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24272 (Diagram 50A) |
||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
16/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1958. Dep: 21/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24273 (Diagram 50A) |
||
13/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/11/1959. Dep: 21/11/1959. | ||
05/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1962. Dep: 13/07/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24239 (Diagram 50A) |
||
02/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
27/12/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63389 from Tyne Dock (52H) |