|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 1922 | 07/1922 | General | ||||
Darlington Works | 03/09/1924 | 12/12/1924 | 101 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 15/11/1929 | 20/01/1930 | 67 days | General | Boiler number HL982 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 26/03/1930 | 05/04/1930 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 25/04/1930 | 04/06/1930 | 41 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 05/04/1934 | 27/04/1934 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 2582 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/09/1937 | 13/10/1937 | 41 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/05/1940 | 12/06/1940 | 30 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 08/03/1941 | 09/04/1941 | 33 days | General | Boiler number D1945 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/07/1942 | 15/08/1942 | 33 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 03/04/1944 | 28/04/1944 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 2385 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 09/09/1945 | 26/09/1945 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 15/03/1947 | 26/04/1947 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 24198 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/05/1947 | 21/05/1947 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 12/09/1948 | 21/09/1948 | 10 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63387 |
||
Darlington Works | 15/09/1949 | 18/10/1949 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 3004 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/10/1950 | 01/11/1950 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 18/12/1951 | 18/01/1952 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24214 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/01/1952 | 30/01/1952 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/06/1953 | 11/07/1953 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/02/1955 | 04/03/1955 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24211 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/03/1955 | 15/03/1955 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 20/02/1957 | 05/04/1957 | 45 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 24/03/1958 | 25/04/1958 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24266 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/03/1963 | 04/04/1963 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24163 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/12/1965 | 25/01/1966 | 28 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
03/12/1966 | Allocation of Q6 class (Tyne Dock) | Tyne Dock: 63344/66/81/7, 63413/20/6/9/31/55/8; Sunderland: 63346/95, 63405/36/7; West Hartlepool: 63368/94/7, 63407/40/50. | SLS/196701 |
02/07/1967 | Eastern Region (North Eastern Section) steam stock (Tyne Dock) | Steam stock has been reduced to 124 as from 2nd July. The allocation of following classes is as under:- Q6 Sunderland: 63395. Tyne Dock: 63344/87, 63431. J27 Sunderland: 65795, 65811/55/79/82/92/94. K1 West Hartlepool: 62045. Tyne Dock: 62005/07/11/50/60. B1 Low Moor: 61030 Nyala, 61306/37. Jubilee Holbeck: 45562 Alberta, 45593 Kolhapur, 45697 Achilles. C1.5 Holbeck: 44826/28/52/96, 44912/43/83, 45080, 45219/73, 45428. Normanton: 44824/54/57, 44990, 45075. Low Moor: 44662/94, 45208. Of the 8F remaining on the N.E. Region, 4 are at Holbeck and 24 at Royston. The W.D. 2-8-0 are allocated to West Hartlepool (6), Sunderland (7), Normanton (14) and Low Moor (D; the 2-6-4Ts to Holbeck (4), Normanton (7), and Low Moor (5) and the C1.4 2-6-0s to West Hartlepool (D, North Blyth (4), Holbeck (2) and Normanton (3). There is still one steam locomotive in Departmental Stock J72 0-6-OT Deptl. 58 (ex 69005). | SLS/196708 |
13/08/1967 | West Hartlepool MPD | The following were on West Hartlepool on 13th August: 43015, 62026/41/2/4, 63344/87/94/7, 63407/31/5, 90061/74/6/116/210/30/54/309/39/47/60/434/59/78/92, 90627/77/95, D2068/77/8, D2153, D2205, D3137/9, D3672, D5152/65, D6756/63/6/9. | SLS/196709 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
0000 | Modification | Diagram 50 number D154(XXX) boiler fitted | ||
11/1917 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2230 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1922. Dep: ?/07/1922. | ||
03/09/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1924. Dep: 12/12/1924. | ||
26/01/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to East Hartlepool (EHL) | ||
15/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1929. Dep: 20/01/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number HL982 (Diagram 50) |
||
26/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/03/1930. Dep: 05/04/1930. | ||
25/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Heavy) - Arr: 25/04/1930. Dep: 04/06/1930. | ||
05/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1934. Dep: 27/04/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2582 (Diagram 50) |
||
03/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1937. Dep: 13/10/1937. | ||
17/04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
14/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 14/05/1940. Dep: 12/06/1940. | ||
08/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1941. Dep: 09/04/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1945 (Diagram 50) |
||
06/09/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
14/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/07/1942. Dep: 15/08/1942. | ||
03/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1944. Dep: 28/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2385 (Diagram 50) |
||
09/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/09/1945. Dep: 26/09/1945. | ||
28/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3387 | ||
15/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1947. Dep: 26/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24198 (Diagram 50) |
||
14/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/05/1947. Dep: 21/05/1947. | ||
12/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/09/1948. Dep: 21/09/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63387 |
||
15/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1949. Dep: 18/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3004 (Diagram 50A) |
||
20/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/10/1950. Dep: 01/11/1950. | ||
18/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1951. Dep: 18/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24214 (Diagram 50A) |
||
24/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/01/1952. Dep: 30/01/1952. | ||
17/08/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B) | ||
06/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B) | ||
29/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/06/1953. Dep: 11/07/1953. | ||
08/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1955. Dep: 04/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24211 (Diagram 50A) |
||
10/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/03/1955. Dep: 15/03/1955. | ||
20/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/02/1957. Dep: 05/04/1957. | ||
24/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1958. Dep: 25/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24266 (Diagram 50A) |
||
01/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Consett (52K) | ||
11/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) | ||
24/02/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
04/03/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1963. Dep: 04/04/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24163 (Diagram 50A) |
||
03/10/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) | ||
29/12/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/12/1965. Dep: 25/01/1966. | ||
12/06/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Normanton (55E) | ||
02/10/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
02/07/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
09/09/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63387 from West Hartlepool (51C) |