|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 27/05/1924 | 27/08/1924 | 93 days | General | Boiler number D131 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 26/07/1928 | 01/10/1928 | 68 days | General | Boiler number D226 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/11/1931 | 08/01/1932 | 66 days | General | Boiler number D697 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1934 | 22/10/1934 | 75 days | General | Boiler number AW34 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/11/1934 | 19/11/1934 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/03/1937 | 14/05/1937 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 24247 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/12/1938 | 28/12/1938 | 21 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/08/1939 | 20/09/1939 | 30 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/11/1941 | 05/12/1941 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 24170 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1943 | 13/02/1943 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/05/1944 | 17/06/1944 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24247 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 15/12/1945 | 31/12/1945 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 14/05/1947 | 28/06/1947 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 24166 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/10/1950 | 02/12/1950 | 39 days | General | Renumbered to BR 63385 |
||
Darlington Works | 14/08/1953 | 05/09/1953 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 24196 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/09/1953 | 17/09/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 19/11/1954 | 17/12/1954 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 14/01/1955 | 24/01/1955 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 27/09/1956 | 19/10/1956 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 24195 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/10/1956 | 25/10/1956 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 15/01/1959 | 06/02/1959 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 06/07/1959 | 21/08/1959 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 24318 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/08/1959 | 15/09/1959 | 19 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1917 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2228 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Selby (SEL) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
27/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1924. Dep: 27/08/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number D131 (Diagram 50) |
||
17/02/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA) | ||
06/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
04/01/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA) | ||
14/05/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
26/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1928. Dep: 01/10/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D226 (Diagram 50) |
||
04/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1931. Dep: 08/01/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D697 (Diagram 50) |
||
09/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1934. Dep: 22/10/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number AW34 (Diagram 50) |
||
09/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/11/1934. Dep: 19/11/1934. | ||
25/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1937. Dep: 14/05/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24247 (Diagram 50) |
||
08/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/12/1938. Dep: 28/12/1938. | ||
17/06/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
22/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1939. Dep: 20/09/1939. | ||
06/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1941. Dep: 05/12/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24170 (Diagram 50) |
||
02/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/02/1943. Dep: 13/02/1943. | ||
14/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
24/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1944. Dep: 17/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24247 (Diagram 50) |
||
04/11/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
15/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/12/1945. Dep: 31/12/1945. | ||
15/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3385 | ||
14/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1947. Dep: 28/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24166 (Diagram 50) |
||
20/07/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
25/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1950. Dep: 02/12/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63385 |
||
14/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1953. Dep: 05/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24196 (Diagram 50) |
||
14/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/09/1953. Dep: 17/09/1953. | ||
19/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/11/1954. Dep: 17/12/1954. | ||
14/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/01/1955. Dep: 24/01/1955. | ||
27/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1956. Dep: 19/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24195 (Diagram 50) |
||
25/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/10/1956. Dep: 25/10/1956. | ||
15/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/01/1959. Dep: 06/02/1959. | ||
06/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1959. Dep: 21/08/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24318 (Diagram 50A) |
||
28/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/08/1959. Dep: 15/09/1959. | ||
24/02/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
16/10/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63385 from Sunderland (52G) |