|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 05/02/1924 | 09/04/1924 | 65 days | General | Boiler number D872 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/06/1926 | 30/11/1926 | 176 days | General | Boiler number D162 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/01/1929 | 13/03/1929 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 2155 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/09/1931 | 16/10/1931 | 36 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/03/1934 | 05/04/1934 | 31 days | General | Boiler number D1956 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1937 | 21/04/1937 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 2434 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/10/1939 | 24/11/1939 | 39 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/11/1939 | 05/12/1939 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/02/1942 | 21/03/1942 | 30 days | General | Boiler number D873 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1943 | 04/12/1943 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2562 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/03/1945 | 21/04/1945 | 27 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 11/02/1947 | 03/04/1947 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 24170 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 21/09/1947 | 04/11/1947 | 45 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gateshead Works | 05/05/1949 | 25/05/1949 | 21 days | Light Casual | Renumbered to BR 63381 |
||
Darlington Works | 15/11/1950 | 23/12/1950 | 39 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/09/1953 | 17/10/1953 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24159 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/10/1953 | 20/10/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 20/05/1954 | 15/06/1954 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 27/06/1957 | 09/08/1957 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 24216 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1957 | 13/08/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/09/1959 | 04/09/1959 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 29/11/1961 | 26/01/1962 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 24290 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/01/1964 | 22/01/1964 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1965 | 24/08/1965 | 48 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/01/1962 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D11, D256/71, D3316, D4083-8, D5107/8/49/72-5, 12119/20, 43053/7, 60812/98, 61275, 61388, 61454, 63381, 63467, 65768/72, 67638, 69005, 78026, 80118, 90397, 90620. Stripping Shop: 43071, 65892, 80117. Outside Stripping Shop: 60835, 61161, 92202. Works Yard: D18, D5096, 43055, 46450, 60809/22, 60963, 64897, 65099, 65862/9, 67681, 67718, 68017/43, 92064, 92199. Crossing: D17, D270/3, D2173, D2247/65, D3140, D4082, D5113. Scrap Road: 61411-3/5/9/36/43/50-2/9/60, 64979, 65741/69, 67707/13/22/39/50/72/5, 68688/9, 68729 all intact. | SLS/196203 |
03/12/1966 | Allocation of Q6 class (Tyne Dock) | Tyne Dock: 63344/66/81/7, 63413/20/6/9/31/55/8; Sunderland: 63346/95, 63405/36/7; West Hartlepool: 63368/94/7, 63407/40/50. | SLS/196701 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1917 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2224 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Selby (SEL) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
05/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1924. Dep: 09/04/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number D872 (Diagram 50) |
||
08/06/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1926. Dep: 30/11/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number D162 (Diagram 50) |
||
25/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1929. Dep: 13/03/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2155 (Diagram 50) |
||
18/11/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
11/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1931. Dep: 16/10/1931. | ||
06/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1934. Dep: 05/04/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1956 (Diagram 50) |
||
18/04/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
11/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1937. Dep: 21/04/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2434 (Diagram 50) |
||
17/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1939. Dep: 24/11/1939. | ||
24/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/11/1939. Dep: 05/12/1939. | ||
20/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1942. Dep: 21/03/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number D873 (Diagram 50) |
||
11/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1943. Dep: 04/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2562 (Diagram 50) |
||
29/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
05/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
26/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/03/1945. Dep: 21/04/1945. | ||
08/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3381 | ||
11/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1947. Dep: 03/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24170 (Diagram 50) |
||
21/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/09/1947. Dep: 04/11/1947. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
05/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/05/1949. Dep: 25/05/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63381 |
||
15/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1950. Dep: 23/12/1950. | ||
22/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1953. Dep: 17/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24159 (Diagram 50) |
||
19/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/10/1953. Dep: 20/10/1953. | ||
20/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/05/1954. Dep: 15/06/1954. | ||
27/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1957. Dep: 09/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24216 (Diagram 50) |
||
12/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/08/1957. Dep: 13/08/1957. | ||
01/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/09/1959. Dep: 04/09/1959. | ||
29/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1961. Dep: 26/01/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24290 (Diagram 50A) |
||
23/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
22/01/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 22/01/1964. Dep: 22/01/1964. | ||
08/07/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/07/1965. Dep: 24/08/1965. | ||
09/01/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
08/12/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63381 from Tyne Dock (52H) |