|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 01/12/1922 | 29/03/1923 | 119 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/09/1925 | 20/01/1926 | 118 days | General | Boiler number D180 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/03/1928 | 03/05/1928 | 59 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1929 | 12/08/1929 | 35 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/01/1931 | 24/02/1931 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 2385 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/10/1933 | 31/10/1933 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 33 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/05/1936 | 04/07/1936 | 61 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 31/01/1939 | 21/03/1939 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 3008 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/06/1941 | 16/07/1941 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 2985 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/03/1943 | 05/04/1943 | 35 days | GQ | Boiler number 3149 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 03/06/1944 | 26/06/1944 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 28/09/1945 | 09/11/1945 | 43 days | General | Boiler number D1940 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 24/12/1946 | 09/01/1947 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1947 | 24/05/1947 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 28/04/1948 | 21/05/1948 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2561 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63374 |
||
Darlington Works | 22/01/1951 | 17/02/1951 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24179 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 07/05/1952 | 30/05/1952 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 09/00/1953 | 02/07/1953 | General | Boiler number 24150 (Diagram 50A) |
|||
Gateshead Works | 05/12/1955 | 06/01/1956 | 33 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1956 | 06/11/1956 | 30 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 30/11/1956 | 04/12/1956 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/10/1957 | 12/12/1957 | 50 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1959 | 24/02/1959 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 13/05/1959 | 12/06/1959 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 24242 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/10/1959 | 10/10/1959 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 30/11/1960 | 09/01/1961 | 41 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 17/02/1961 | 23/02/1961 | 7 days | Unclassified | After collision |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/02/1948 | Darlington Works | New 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 9010. No. 9001 has returned to N.Rd with a damaged buffer beam. Nos. 9002-9006 are still working from Darlington and Nos. 9007-9010 have not yet been handed over to the shed. Nos. 9004/5 are Darlington 2023/4 of 1948, both bearing a January paint date. Locomotives for shops during February included Nos. 510, 804, 822, 2933, 2937, 2993, 3279, 3298, 3375, 3420, 4756, 5063, 5612, 5691, 5878, 7266, 7604, 7608, 8235, 8248, 8250, 8273, 8277, 8427, 8730, 9419, 9834, 9838 an 9875. Of these Nos. 3279, 5063 and 9419 are in the scrap yard, No. 9419 being cut up at the end of February. Locomotives ex shops during February included Nos. 937, 1069, 2354, 2382, 2386, 2982, 3260, 3370, 3373, 3374, 5645, 5646, 5663, 5716, 5769, 5805, 7243, 7334, 8230, 8272, 8310, 8402, 8433, 8727, 8729, 8748, 9097, 9118, 9376 an 9780. 'B.1' No. 1069 is painted green and lettered 'British Railways' as No. 1289 (NBL 26190/47) | SLS/194804 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1917 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2217 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
01/12/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1922. Dep: 29/03/1923. | ||
25/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1925. Dep: 20/01/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number D180 (Diagram 50) |
||
06/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1928. Dep: 03/05/1928. | ||
09/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1929. Dep: 12/08/1929. | ||
15/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1931. Dep: 24/02/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2385 (Diagram 50) |
||
02/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1933. Dep: 31/10/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 33 (Diagram 50) |
||
05/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1936. Dep: 04/07/1936. | ||
31/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1939. Dep: 21/03/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3008 (Diagram 50A) |
||
20/01/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
10/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1941. Dep: 16/07/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2985 (Diagram 50A) |
||
02/03/1943 | Works Visit | |||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
23/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
03/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/06/1944. Dep: 26/06/1944. | ||
28/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1945. Dep: 09/11/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1940 (Diagram 50) |
||
25/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3374 | ||
24/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/12/1946. Dep: 09/01/1947. | ||
25/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/04/1947. Dep: 24/05/1947. | ||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) | ||
28/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1948. Dep: 21/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2561 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63374 |
||
22/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1951. Dep: 17/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24179 (Diagram 50A) |
||
07/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/05/1952. Dep: 30/05/1952. | ||
09/00/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/00/1953. Dep: 02/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24150 (Diagram 50A) |
||
05/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/12/1955. Dep: 06/01/1956. | ||
08/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/10/1956. Dep: 06/11/1956. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
30/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/11/1956. Dep: 04/12/1956. | ||
24/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 24/10/1957. Dep: 12/12/1957. | ||
09/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/02/1959. Dep: 24/02/1959. | ||
13/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1959. Dep: 12/06/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24242 (Diagram 50A) |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
05/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/10/1959. Dep: 10/10/1959. | ||
30/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/11/1960. Dep: 09/01/1961. | ||
17/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/02/1961. Dep: 23/02/1961. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
25/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
29/04/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63374 from West Auckland (51F) |