|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 09/04/1923 | 23/06/1923 | 76 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 07/07/1925 | 06/10/1925 | 92 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 03/07/1928 | 18/09/1928 | 78 days | General | Boiler number E4/16 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 18/10/1928 | 30/10/1928 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 19/10/1931 | 05/01/1932 | 79 days | Heavy | |||
Gateshead Works | 16/02/1932 | 19/02/1932 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1934 | 01/08/1934 | 57 days | General | Boiler number AW23 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/02/1937 | 22/04/1937 | 65 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 17/07/1939 | 23/08/1939 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 24238 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/11/1941 | 06/12/1941 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24229 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/02/1944 | 11/09/1944 | 221 days | General | Boiler number 24238 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/01/1946 | 02/02/1946 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/03/1947 | 03/05/1947 | 57 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 20/09/1948 | 28/09/1948 | 9 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63364 |
||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1949 | 25/06/1949 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 3149 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/06/1949 | 29/06/1949 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/08/1951 | 20/09/1951 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 24272 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/08/1953 | 11/09/1953 | 24 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 21/09/1953 | 22/09/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/03/1954 | 23/04/1954 | 40 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 02/11/1955 | 05/01/1956 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 24236 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 23/06/1958 | 03/10/1958 | 103 days | General | Boiler number 24174 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/08/1959 | 03/09/1959 | 18 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1294 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
09/04/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1923. Dep: 23/06/1923. | ||
07/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1925. Dep: 06/10/1925. | ||
03/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1928. Dep: 18/09/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number E4/16 (Diagram 50) |
||
18/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/10/1928. Dep: 30/10/1928. | ||
19/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Heavy) - Arr: 19/10/1931. Dep: 05/01/1932. | ||
16/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/02/1932. Dep: 19/02/1932. | ||
06/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1934. Dep: 01/08/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number AW23 (Diagram 50) |
||
17/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/02/1937. Dep: 22/04/1937. | ||
24/06/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annfield Plain (AFP) | ||
15/07/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
17/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1939. Dep: 23/08/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24238 (Diagram 50A) |
||
05/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1941. Dep: 06/12/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24229 (Diagram 50A) |
||
10/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
04/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1944. Dep: 11/09/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24238 (Diagram 50A) |
||
05/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
04/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/01/1946. Dep: 02/02/1946. | ||
31/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3364 | ||
08/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1947. Dep: 03/05/1947. | ||
05/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
20/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/09/1948. Dep: 28/09/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63364 |
||
25/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1949. Dep: 25/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3149 (Diagram 50A) |
||
27/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/06/1949. Dep: 29/06/1949. | ||
24/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1951. Dep: 20/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24272 (Diagram 50A) |
||
19/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/08/1953. Dep: 11/09/1953. | ||
21/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/09/1953. Dep: 22/09/1953. | ||
15/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/03/1954. Dep: 23/04/1954. | ||
02/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1955. Dep: 05/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24236 (Diagram 50A) |
||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
23/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1958. Dep: 03/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24174 (Diagram 50A) |
||
17/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/08/1959. Dep: 03/09/1959. | ||
29/04/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63364 from Thornaby (51L) |