|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 11/04/1923 | 20/07/1923 | 101 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 12/11/1925 | 25/02/1926 | 106 days | General | Boiler number 25 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/08/1928 | 17/10/1928 | 52 days | General | Boiler number D146 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/01/1931 | 13/02/1931 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2383 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/07/1933 | 16/08/1933 | 37 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/08/1935 | 04/10/1935 | 36 days | General | Boiler number D1942 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/09/1936 | 04/12/1936 | 73 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1938 | 04/10/1938 | 57 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/06/1940 | 22/06/1940 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3150 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/03/1941 | 07/04/1941 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 31/07/1942 | 12/09/1942 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 23/11/1944 | 16/12/1944 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 3311 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 01/05/1946 | 11/05/1946 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 21/11/1947 | 12/1947 | General | Boiler number 3317 (Diagram 50A) |
|||
Gateshead Works | 14/06/1949 | 12/07/1949 | 29 days | Light Casual | Renumbered to BR 63357 |
||
Darlington Works | 08/11/1950 | 23/12/1950 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 24167 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/11/1951 | 20/11/1951 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 14/01/1954 | 06/02/1954 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 24258 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/02/1954 | 20/02/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/03/1954 | 13/03/1954 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/03/1954 | 18/03/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 14/02/1955 | 24/02/1955 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 21/06/1956 | 14/08/1956 | 55 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Gateshead Works | 27/05/1957 | 21/06/1957 | 26 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 26/04/1961 | 20/05/1961 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 24286 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/08/1962 | 06/09/1962 | 32 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 15/07/1963 | 30/08/1963 | 47 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/11/1953 | Darlington Works | North Road have cut up 65022 an 65497 from E.R. also 'Sentinel' 8137 (still L.N.E.R. lettering and numbers). Waiting Works are: 68035/923/68/71, 61017/60/71, 61214/55, 61422, 62773, 63357/72, 63468, 67635/69, 67761/6/7, 69783, 90016/55/162/8/430/4/633/96. 67669 is dual fitted. 69783 has a chimney like the old A6 class carried. | SLS/195402 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1283 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Selby (SEL) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
11/04/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1923. Dep: 20/07/1923. | ||
08/11/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
12/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1925. Dep: 25/02/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 25 (Diagram 50) |
||
27/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1928. Dep: 17/10/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D146 (Diagram 50) |
||
06/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1931. Dep: 13/02/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2383 (Diagram 50) |
||
11/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1933. Dep: 16/08/1933. | ||
30/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1935. Dep: 04/10/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1942 (Diagram 50) |
||
23/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 23/09/1936. Dep: 04/12/1936. | ||
09/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1938. Dep: 04/10/1938. | ||
01/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1940. Dep: 22/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3150 (Diagram 50A) |
||
07/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/03/1941. Dep: 07/04/1941. | ||
31/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1942. Dep: 12/09/1942. | ||
04/12/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Consett (CON) | ||
23/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1944. Dep: 16/12/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3311 (Diagram 50A) |
||
07/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3357 | ||
01/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/05/1946. Dep: 11/05/1946. | ||
21/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1947. Dep: ?/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3317 (Diagram 50A) |
||
14/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/06/1949. Dep: 12/07/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63357 |
||
08/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1950. Dep: 23/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24167 (Diagram 50A) |
||
03/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/11/1951. Dep: 20/11/1951. | ||
14/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1954. Dep: 06/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24258 (Diagram 50A) |
||
17/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/02/1954. Dep: 20/02/1954. | ||
09/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/03/1954. Dep: 13/03/1954. | ||
16/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/03/1954. Dep: 18/03/1954. | ||
14/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/02/1955. Dep: 24/02/1955. | ||
21/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/06/1956. Dep: 14/08/1956. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
27/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1957. Dep: 21/06/1957. | ||
22/06/1957 | Modification | Diagram 50A number 24308 boiler fitted | ||
26/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1961. Dep: 20/05/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24286 (Diagram 50A) |
||
06/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/08/1962. Dep: 06/09/1962. | ||
15/07/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/07/1963. Dep: 30/08/1963. | ||
17/05/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63357 from Consett (52K) |