|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 04/01/1923 | 23/03/1923 | 79 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/08/1925 | 30/09/1925 | 42 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 11/06/1926 | 19/08/1926 | 70 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 03/01/1928 | 14/03/1928 | 72 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 21/08/1928 | 12/09/1928 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 08/10/1929 | 27/11/1929 | 51 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 09/10/1931 | 12/11/1931 | 35 days | General | Boiler number D873 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 19/01/1932 | 02/02/1932 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 05/11/1934 | 05/12/1934 | 31 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 29/06/1937 | 16/09/1937 | 80 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 27/11/1939 | 11/01/1940 | 46 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 27/01/1942 | 27/02/1942 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2394 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/09/1943 | 30/09/1943 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 2393 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/08/1945 | 25/08/1945 | 25 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 31/10/1945 | 01/12/1945 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 10/12/1946 | 18/01/1947 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 2392 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/01/1947 | 04/02/1947 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/02/1947 | 28/02/1947 | 21 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 18/06/1948 | 29/06/1948 | 12 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63354 |
||
Darlington Works | 28/11/1949 | 30/12/1949 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24217 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/10/1951 | 09/11/1951 | 29 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gateshead Works | 07/03/1952 | 04/04/1952 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 29/06/1954 | 30/07/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 24219 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/10/1956 | 11/10/1956 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 21/12/1956 | 19/01/1957 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 08/07/1957 | 23/08/1957 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 24310 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/05/1961 | 27/05/1961 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24179 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/12/1962 | 30/01/1963 | 35 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 15/01/1964 | 15/01/1964 | 1 day | Weighing |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
09/07/1961 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1278 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
04/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1923. Dep: 23/03/1923. | ||
20/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/08/1925. Dep: 30/09/1925. | ||
13/04/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
11/06/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/06/1926. Dep: 19/08/1926. | ||
03/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1928. Dep: 14/03/1928. | ||
21/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/08/1928. Dep: 12/09/1928. | ||
08/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/10/1929. Dep: 27/11/1929. | ||
09/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1931. Dep: 12/11/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D873 (Diagram 50) |
||
19/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/01/1932. Dep: 02/02/1932. | ||
05/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1934. Dep: 05/12/1934. | ||
29/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1937. Dep: 16/09/1937. | ||
27/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1939. Dep: 11/01/1940. | ||
27/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1942. Dep: 27/02/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2394 (Diagram 50) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
14/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
04/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1943. Dep: 30/09/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2393 (Diagram 50) |
||
09/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
23/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
01/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/08/1945. Dep: 25/08/1945. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
31/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/10/1945. Dep: 01/12/1945. | ||
14/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3354 | ||
10/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1946. Dep: 18/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2392 (Diagram 50) |
||
20/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/01/1947. Dep: 04/02/1947. | ||
08/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/02/1947. Dep: 28/02/1947. | ||
06/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
18/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/06/1948. Dep: 29/06/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63354 |
||
28/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1949. Dep: 30/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24217 (Diagram 50A) |
||
12/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/10/1951. Dep: 09/11/1951. | ||
07/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/03/1952. Dep: 04/04/1952. | ||
29/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1954. Dep: 30/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24219 (Diagram 50A) |
||
05/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/10/1956. Dep: 11/10/1956. | ||
21/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/12/1956. Dep: 19/01/1957. | ||
08/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1957. Dep: 23/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24310 (Diagram 50A) |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
13/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Consett (52K) | ||
01/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1961. Dep: 27/05/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24179 (Diagram 50A) |
||
23/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
27/12/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/12/1962. Dep: 30/01/1963. | ||
15/01/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 15/01/1964. Dep: 15/01/1964. | ||
21/05/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63354 from Blyth (North) (52F) |