|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 12/05/1924 | 29/07/1924 | 79 days | General | Boiler number D1569 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 10/02/1928 | 27/04/1928 | 78 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 10/07/1931 | 19/08/1931 | 41 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 27/10/1936 | 15/12/1936 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 2433 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/10/1940 | 15/11/1940 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 3153 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1943 | 08/04/1943 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 2985 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 07/07/1944 | 02/08/1944 | 27 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 16/01/1945 | 24/02/1945 | 40 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/11/1945 | 19/12/1945 | 25 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 31/05/1948 | 16/06/1948 | 17 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63351 |
||
Darlington Works | 20/04/1949 | 14/05/1949 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 3015 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/04/1951 | 05/05/1951 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 24184 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/07/1953 | 18/07/1953 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 24291 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/08/1953 | 08/08/1953 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/02/1956 | 01/03/1956 | 25 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 09/02/1959 | 25/03/1959 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 24186 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/09/1962 | 12/10/1962 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 24257 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/10/1962 | 25/10/1962 | 9 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1949 | Darlington Works | New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. | SLS/194907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1264 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
12/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1924. Dep: 29/07/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1569 (Diagram 50) |
||
10/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1928. Dep: 27/04/1928. | ||
10/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1931. Dep: 19/08/1931. | ||
27/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1936. Dep: 15/12/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2433 (Diagram 50) |
||
24/06/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annfield Plain (AFP) | ||
09/09/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Consett (CON) | ||
21/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1940. Dep: 15/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3153 (Diagram 50A) |
||
12/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1943. Dep: 08/04/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2985 (Diagram 50A) |
||
07/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/07/1944. Dep: 02/08/1944. | ||
16/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/01/1945. Dep: 24/02/1945. | ||
25/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1945. Dep: 19/12/1945. | ||
29/12/1945 | Modification | Diagram 50A number 3149 boiler fitted | ||
07/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3351 | ||
29/11/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
31/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/05/1948. Dep: 16/06/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63351 |
||
13/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
19/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
20/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1949. Dep: 14/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3015 (Diagram 50A) |
||
16/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1951. Dep: 05/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24184 (Diagram 50A) |
||
01/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1953. Dep: 18/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24291 (Diagram 50A) |
||
04/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/08/1953. Dep: 08/08/1953. | ||
29/08/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) | ||
06/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/02/1956. Dep: 01/03/1956. | ||
09/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1959. Dep: 25/03/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24186 (Diagram 50A) |
||
07/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1962. Dep: 12/10/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24257 (Diagram 50A) |
||
17/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/10/1962. Dep: 25/10/1962. | ||
24/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
18/01/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63351 from West Hartlepool (51C) |