|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 1921 | 11/1921 | General | ||||
Gateshead Works | 26/11/1925 | 27/05/1926 | 183 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 30/07/1928 | 12/09/1928 | 45 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 19/12/1928 | 17/01/1929 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 13/01/1931 | 25/02/1931 | 44 days | General | Boiler number D539 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/02/1936 | 18/04/1936 | 75 days | General | Boiler number AW13 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/08/1939 | 16/09/1939 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 2260 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/12/1942 | 20/01/1943 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24230 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 17/09/1945 | 08/10/1945 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 19/11/1946 | 04/01/1947 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 988 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/01/1947 | 16/01/1947 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 03/05/1948 | 19/05/1948 | 17 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63350 |
||
Darlington Works | 05/04/1950 | 29/04/1950 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 2423 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/05/1950 | 09/05/1950 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/10/1952 | 08/11/1952 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 24239 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/04/1955 | 12/05/1955 | 28 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 19/05/1955 | 26/05/1955 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/09/1955 | 26/09/1955 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/10/1957 | 03/10/1957 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 04/08/1958 | 05/09/1958 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24214 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/12/1960 | 13/02/1961 | 48 days | Heavy Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1262 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: ?/1921. Dep: ?/11/1921. | ||
08/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annfield Plain (AFP) | ||
01/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
26/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1925. Dep: 27/05/1926. | ||
01/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annfield Plain (AFP) | ||
30/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/07/1928. Dep: 12/09/1928. | ||
19/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/12/1928. Dep: 17/01/1929. | ||
14/10/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
13/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1931. Dep: 25/02/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number D539 (Diagram 50) |
||
18/06/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to East Hartlepool (EHL) | ||
04/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1936. Dep: 18/04/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number AW13 (Diagram 50) |
||
01/03/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
19/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1939. Dep: 16/09/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2260 (Diagram 50) |
||
06/01/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
19/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1942. Dep: 20/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24230 (Diagram 50) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
26/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
24/08/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
23/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
17/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/09/1945. Dep: 08/10/1945. | ||
28/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3350 | ||
19/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1946. Dep: 04/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 988 (Diagram 50) |
||
10/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/01/1947. Dep: 16/01/1947. | ||
13/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
21/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
03/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/05/1948. Dep: 19/05/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63350 |
||
05/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1950. Dep: 29/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2423 (Diagram 50) |
||
01/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/05/1950. Dep: 09/05/1950. | ||
14/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1952. Dep: 08/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24239 (Diagram 50A) |
||
15/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/04/1955. Dep: 12/05/1955. | ||
19/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/05/1955. Dep: 26/05/1955. | ||
22/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/09/1955. Dep: 26/09/1955. | ||
01/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/10/1957. Dep: 03/10/1957. | ||
04/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1958. Dep: 05/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24214 (Diagram 50A) |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
28/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 28/12/1960. Dep: 13/02/1961. | ||
18/06/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63350 from Tyne Dock (52H) |