|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 1921 | 07/1921 | General | Boiler number D201 (Diagram 50) |
|||
Darlington Works | 18/07/1923 | 12/10/1923 | 87 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 29/01/1926 | 22/06/1926 | 145 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/07/1929 | 19/09/1929 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 2261 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/04/1932 | 23/05/1932 | 33 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/06/1934 | 01/08/1934 | 43 days | General | Boiler number D1941 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/09/1936 | 30/10/1936 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 2561 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1939 | 09/09/1939 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 2565 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/02/1942 | 13/03/1942 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 28/05/1942 | 06/07/1942 | 40 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 19/05/1944 | 16/06/1944 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 22/08/1945 | 21/09/1945 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2155 (Diagram 50) |
||
Gateshead Works | 03/12/1946 | 14/12/1946 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 10/02/1948 | 05/03/1948 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 2876 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3342 |
||
Darlington Works | 15/03/1948 | 22/03/1948 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1951 | 16/06/1951 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 24180 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63342 |
||
Darlington Works | 29/01/1954 | 25/02/1954 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 24151 (Diagram 50) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/03/1954 | 11/03/1954 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/04/1954 | 15/04/1954 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/05/1954 | 15/05/1954 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 01/04/1957 | 03/05/1957 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24204 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1960 | 13/04/1960 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 24306 (Diagram 50A) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/09/1961 | 13/11/1961 | 49 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/09/1947 | WD | The Italian State Railways have commenced renumbering the W.D. and U.S.A. locomotives they took over in 1946. Three classes have so far had new numbers allocated to them. The W.D. 2-8-2 Nos. 71016/28/37/8/40/83/4/5/7/9/95/7/8/1100/6/9/10/3/4/9/20/46/8/51/7/66/7/89/91/3, are to become 747.001 to 747.030. No. 71027 taken over in 1946 has apparently been withdrawn. The USA. 2-8-0 Nos. 1650/75/93/6, 1711/6/8/32/4/7/40/1/7/52/3/61/5/7/74/5/82, 1783/5/99, 1851/2/7/8/60/5/6/8/70, 2059/60/6/7/8/9/70/8/9/80/1, 2736-50, 2766-75, 3275-8, 3283-3320, 3322-6, 3328/9/32/4/5/6/7/9/42/8/50, 3380-96, 3405-8, 3411-28, 3430, 3562/8/9/70/1/2, 3611/7/8/9/22/3/40/1, 3660-71, 3685-99, 4418/21/37, 5701/2/31/5/6, 5740-58, 5760/1, 5825/9/34, 5835/44/5, are to become 736.001 to 736.243. Of these up to No. 2081 saw previous service in Algeria and Tunisia. The rest were shipped direct from the U.S.A. to Naples. No. 4418 was noted as Alco. 73410 of 1945. U.S.A. 0-6-OT Nos. 1927/9/30/1 are to become 831.001 to 831.004. No. 1928 has been withdrawn or sold. No mention has yet been made of the renumbering of the Stanier 2-8-0, but it seems more than likely that they will become Nos. 737.001 to 737.015. | SLS/194711 |
30/04/1950 | Derby Works | Nos. 46100 an 46155 are being converted to taper-boiler 'Scots.' New Work. On 19/5, 2-6-4 tanks Nos. 42143/4 were complete (the latter in the Paint Shop), and frames for the next two were erected. New 2-6-4 tanks for the Ulster Transport Authority were also in progress. No. 54 had the boiler and tanks mounted, and the frames of Nos. 55 and 56 were in position. Entering Works during April: These included Nos. 377, 526, 40537, 40675, 41003/09/21/23/34/47/51/84, 1085, 41094, 1158, 1699, 1773/79/80, 1814, 42327/74/88, 42500/16/31/34, 2992, 43211, 3313/42/94, 3401/08, 43411, 3457, 43660, 3833/44, 43857/58/69, 3946, 43976, 44050, 4066, 44163, 44216,4313, 44316, 4432/34, 44394, 44555, 4605, 58137, 58283, W.R. No. 2156. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, with the crest, were Nos. 40014/42/48, 40418, 41073, 42348/60/86/97. In addition. the following also carry the crest: Nos. 43401, 43507/95/98, 43832, 43962, 44092, 44153, 44273, 44532/78, 53807, 58121, 58214, 47212, 47345, 47448, W.R. Nos. 2134/36/86, while Nos. 40037/40, 40417, 40557, 40675, 40930, 41014/91/97, 41158, 41727, 42305, 42407., 42505/35, 43342, 43810/33/58/70, 43940, 44434, 47400/66, 47587 were all ex Works still lettered 'L.M.S.' 58214 is believed to be the first Class '2F' to receive the crest. Withdrawn locomotives: These have been cut up as follows: w/e 14/4 No. 1322; w/e 21/4 Nos. 561, 3408. Stored locomotives: On 28/4 Nos. 404, 40411/16, 41059 were noted stored near the station. | SLS/195006 |
30/06/1951 | Locomotives still not renumbered | Although it is well over three years since the B.R. renumbering scheme was introduced, there were several classes with a small percentage still not renumbered (or at any rate not advised as done) at the end of June-Class B16 (69 survivors): Nos. 1419/23/33. Class D20 (28 survivors): Nos. 2360/72/95. Class Q5 (4 survivors): Nos. 3270, 3311/4/26. Of this large class, only 9 received B.R. numbers, the last to be done being 63313(2/12/48). None of the renumbered engines survives. Class Q6 is completely renumbered, No. 63342 having just been done. Class Q7 (15 engines): all done except. No. 3460. Class J21 (37 survivors): all done except 5025, 5117/22. Class J24 (6 survivors): not renumbered are 5623 (Scotland) and 5644. Class J25 (57 survivors): all done except 5663/7/86, 5727. (5699 has become 65699 but no trace of advice). Class J26 was completed on 19/5/51 when 65769 was done. Class J27 (115 engines): all done except 5890/4. Class G5 (106 survivors): all renumbered by 31/3/51. Class J71 (76 survivors): twelve to be done, Nos. 8230/1/9/47/9/51/4/72/98, 8304/11/6-an unusually large percentage not dealt with. Class J77 (38 survivors): Nos. 8405/38 not renumbered. Class J72 (113 engines): to be renumbered 8672/81, 8730(?), 8748. Class N10 (19 survivors): all done (?except 9095). | SLS/195108 |
11/11/1961 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1913 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1249 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) Diagram 50 boiler fitted |
||
1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1921. Dep: ?/07/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number D201 (Diagram 50) |
||
18/07/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1923. Dep: 12/10/1923. | ||
23/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
29/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1926. Dep: 22/06/1926. | ||
30/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1929. Dep: 19/09/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2261 (Diagram 50) |
||
21/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1932. Dep: 23/05/1932. | ||
20/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1934. Dep: 01/08/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1941 (Diagram 50) |
||
16/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1936. Dep: 30/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2561 (Diagram 50) |
||
08/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1939. Dep: 09/09/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2565 (Diagram 50) |
||
24/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/02/1942. Dep: 13/03/1942. | ||
28/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1942. Dep: 06/07/1942. | ||
04/12/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
19/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/05/1944. Dep: 16/06/1944. | ||
22/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1945. Dep: 21/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2155 (Diagram 50) |
||
07/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3342 | ||
03/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/12/1946. Dep: 14/12/1946. | ||
10/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1948. Dep: 05/03/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2876 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3342 |
||
15/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/03/1948. Dep: 22/03/1948. | ||
25/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1951. Dep: 16/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24180 (Diagram 50) Renumbered to BR 63342 |
||
29/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1954. Dep: 25/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24151 (Diagram 50) |
||
05/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/03/1954. Dep: 11/03/1954. | ||
07/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/04/1954. Dep: 15/04/1954. | ||
08/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/05/1954. Dep: 15/05/1954. | ||
01/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1957. Dep: 03/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24204 (Diagram 50A) |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Consett (52K) | ||
11/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1960. Dep: 13/04/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24306 (Diagram 50A) |
||
26/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/09/1961. Dep: 13/11/1961. | ||
06/05/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sunderland (52G) | ||
04/12/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63342 from Sunderland (52G) |