|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1922 | 07/1922 | General | |||||
Gateshead Works | 16/09/1925 | 11/12/1925 | 87 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 03/07/1928 | 13/09/1928 | 73 days | General | Boiler number D1060 (Diagram 56) |
||
Gateshead Works | 11/08/1932 | 04/10/1932 | 55 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/09/1937 | 29/10/1937 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 2911 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/07/1939 | 02/08/1939 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/09/1940 | 23/10/1940 | 36 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 20/10/1941 | 21/11/1941 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 3233 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/11/1943 | 18/12/1943 | 33 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 18/12/1944 | 20/01/1945 | 34 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 27/05/1946 | 13/06/1946 | 18 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3321 |
||
Darlington Works | 11/02/1948 | 11/02/1948 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1911 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 643 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number Allocated to Annfield Plain (AFP) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
16/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1925. Dep: 11/12/1925. | ||
03/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1928. Dep: 13/09/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1060 (Diagram 56) |
||
11/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1932. Dep: 04/10/1932. | ||
24/06/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
28/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1937. Dep: 29/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2911 (Diagram 56B) |
||
19/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/07/1939. Dep: 02/08/1939. | ||
01/03/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
18/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/09/1940. Dep: 23/10/1940. | ||
20/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1941. Dep: 21/11/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3233 (Diagram 56B) |
||
16/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/11/1943. Dep: 18/12/1943. | ||
18/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1944. Dep: 20/01/1945. | ||
27/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/05/1946. Dep: 13/06/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3321 |
||
1948 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
11/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 11/02/1948. Dep: 11/02/1948. | ||
06/03/1948 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3321 from Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63321 but not taken up |