|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1912 | 12/1912 | General | |||||
1916 | 05/1916 | General | |||||
1919 | 02/1919 | General | |||||
1922 | 05/1922 | General | |||||
Darlington Works | 01/05/1925 | 17/08/1925 | 109 days | General | Boiler number D1006 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/03/1926 | 06/07/1926 | 99 days | General | Boiler number G957 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1929 | 22/11/1929 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 2229 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/12/1932 | 30/01/1933 | 32 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/03/1936 | 14/04/1936 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/03/1939 | 20/04/1939 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2153 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/10/1941 | 20/11/1941 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 3232 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/04/1944 | 18/05/1944 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 3241 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1945 | 13/06/1945 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1947 | 03/06/1947 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1907 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1032 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 520 Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
07/12/1912 | Modification | Diagram 56 number D1919 boiler fitted | ||
07/05/1916 | Modification | Diagram 56 number D1923 boiler fitted | ||
07/02/1919 | Modification | Diagram 56 number D6 boiler fitted | ||
06/09/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
22/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
01/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1925. Dep: 17/08/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1006 (Diagram 56) |
||
18/08/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
30/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1926. Dep: 06/07/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number G957 (Diagram 56) |
||
01/02/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shildon (SHI) | ||
08/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1929. Dep: 22/11/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2229 (Diagram 56) |
||
30/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1932. Dep: 30/01/1933. | ||
07/01/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
02/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1936. Dep: 14/04/1936. | ||
31/12/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kirkby Stephen (KBY) | ||
13/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1939. Dep: 20/04/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2153 (Diagram 56) |
||
14/11/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
11/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1941. Dep: 20/11/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3232 (Diagram 56B) |
||
21/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1944. Dep: 18/05/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3241 (Diagram 56B) |
||
13/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 13/06/1945. Dep: 13/06/1945. | ||
20/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3304 | ||
03/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 03/06/1947. Dep: 03/06/1947. | ||
19/07/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3304 from Darlington (DAR) |