|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1911 | 05/1911 | General | Boiler number G327 (Diagram 56) |
||||
1915 | 03/1915 | General | Boiler number D26 (Diagram 56) |
||||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1924 | 16/12/1924 | 70 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 29/06/1926 | 17/09/1926 | 81 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 07/01/1929 | 10/01/1929 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1929 | 30/09/1929 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 2279 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/07/1933 | 23/08/1933 | 41 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/09/1936 | 31/10/1936 | 37 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/01/1940 | 23/02/1940 | 33 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/03/1942 | 01/04/1942 | 31 days | General | Boiler number D1427 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/11/1942 | 16/12/1942 | 24 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/08/1943 | 04/09/1943 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1944 | 06/07/1944 | 24 days | General | Boiler number D1453 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/09/1946 | 12/10/1946 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 3123 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Gateshead Works | 13/02/1948 | 26/02/1948 | 14 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3296 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/09/1947 | WD | The Italian State Railways have commenced renumbering the W.D. and U.S.A. locomotives they took over in 1946. Three classes have so far had new numbers allocated to them. The W.D. 2-8-2 Nos. 71016/28/37/8/40/83/4/5/7/9/95/7/8/1100/6/9/10/3/4/9/20/46/8/51/7/66/7/89/91/3, are to become 747.001 to 747.030. No. 71027 taken over in 1946 has apparently been withdrawn. The USA. 2-8-0 Nos. 1650/75/93/6, 1711/6/8/32/4/7/40/1/7/52/3/61/5/7/74/5/82, 1783/5/99, 1851/2/7/8/60/5/6/8/70, 2059/60/6/7/8/9/70/8/9/80/1, 2736-50, 2766-75, 3275-8, 3283-3320, 3322-6, 3328/9/32/4/5/6/7/9/42/8/50, 3380-96, 3405-8, 3411-28, 3430, 3562/8/9/70/1/2, 3611/7/8/9/22/3/40/1, 3660-71, 3685-99, 4418/21/37, 5701/2/31/5/6, 5740-58, 5760/1, 5825/9/34, 5835/44/5, are to become 736.001 to 736.243. Of these up to No. 2081 saw previous service in Algeria and Tunisia. The rest were shipped direct from the U.S.A. to Naples. No. 4418 was noted as Alco. 73410 of 1945. U.S.A. 0-6-OT Nos. 1927/9/30/1 are to become 831.001 to 831.004. No. 1928 has been withdrawn or sold. No mention has yet been made of the renumbering of the Stanier 2-8-0, but it seems more than likely that they will become Nos. 737.001 to 737.015. | SLS/194711 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1904 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1111 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 7 Allocated to Haverton Hill (HAV) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
08/10/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1924. Dep: 16/12/1924. | ||
29/06/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1926. Dep: 17/09/1926. | ||
07/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/01/1929. Dep: 10/01/1929. | ||
12/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1929. Dep: 30/09/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2279 (Diagram 56) |
||
14/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1933. Dep: 23/08/1933. | ||
25/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1936. Dep: 31/10/1936. | ||
22/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1940. Dep: 23/02/1940. | ||
02/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1942. Dep: 01/04/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1427 (Diagram 56) |
||
23/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/11/1942. Dep: 16/12/1942. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
05/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/08/1943. Dep: 04/09/1943. | ||
23/12/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
13/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1944. Dep: 06/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1453 (Diagram 56) |
||
22/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
14/01/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
20/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3296 | ||
11/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1946. Dep: 12/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3123 (Diagram 56B) |
||
13/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/02/1948. Dep: 26/02/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3296 |
||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63296 but not taken up | ||
08/1949 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
22/08/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3296 from Borough Gardens (BOR) |