|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1920 | 04/1920 | General | |||||
Darlington Works | 12/04/1923 | 29/06/1923 | 79 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/01/1926 | 18/06/1926 | 142 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/05/1929 | 02/08/1929 | 73 days | General | Boiler number D1745 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/10/1933 | 28/11/1933 | 33 days | General | Boiler number D1004 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/05/1938 | 17/06/1938 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2278 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/06/1938 | 27/06/1938 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/06/1940 | 02/07/1940 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/01/1941 | 27/01/1941 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 3132 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/02/1943 | 26/03/1943 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2086 (Diagram 56)) |
||
Gateshead Works | 19/09/1944 | 07/10/1944 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/06/1945 | 07/07/1945 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 14/11/1945 | 14/12/1945 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2930 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Gateshead Works | 30/01/1947 | 08/02/1947 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 18/05/1948 | 11/06/1948 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 2794 (Diagram 56B) Renumbered to BR 63290 |
||
Darlington Works | 15/06/1948 | 24/06/1948 | 10 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/07/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order. Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year. No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751. Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420. |
SLS/194808 |
02/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103. Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329. |
SLS/194901 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1903 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1110 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 6 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
07/04/1920 | Modification | Diagram 56 number D1046 boiler fitted | ||
12/04/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1923. Dep: 29/06/1923. | ||
10/10/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
28/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1926. Dep: 18/06/1926. | ||
03/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
21/02/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
13/05/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
22/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1929. Dep: 02/08/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1745 (Diagram 56) |
||
14/10/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annfield Plain (AFP) | ||
27/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1933. Dep: 28/11/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1004 (Diagram 56) |
||
24/06/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
29/03/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
05/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1938. Dep: 17/06/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2278 (Diagram 56) |
||
20/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/06/1938. Dep: 27/06/1938. | ||
07/11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
16/06/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
11/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/06/1940. Dep: 02/07/1940. | ||
01/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1941. Dep: 27/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3132 (Diagram 56B) |
||
24/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1943. Dep: 26/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2086 (Diagram 56)) |
||
19/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/09/1944. Dep: 07/10/1944. | ||
13/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/06/1945. Dep: 07/07/1945. | ||
14/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1945. Dep: 14/12/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2930 (Diagram 56B) |
||
20/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3290 | ||
30/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/01/1947. Dep: 08/02/1947. | ||
18/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1948. Dep: 11/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2794 (Diagram 56B) Renumbered to BR 63290 |
||
15/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/06/1948. Dep: 24/06/1948. | ||
14/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
20/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
24/04/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
30/04/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
15/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
21/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
07/1950 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
25/07/1950 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63290 from Selby (50C) |