|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1914 | 10/1914 | General | Boiler number G329 (Diagram 56) |
||||
1919 | 10/1919 | General | |||||
Darlington Works | 26/06/1922 | 20/09/1922 | 87 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 21/09/1925 | 09/12/1925 | 80 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 19/12/1928 | 07/02/1929 | 51 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 29/06/1932 | 05/08/1932 | 38 days | General | Boiler number D737 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/02/1936 | 23/03/1936 | 43 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1937 | 17/04/1937 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2073 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/04/1937 | 14/05/1937 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/12/1939 | 31/01/1940 | 58 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/07/1942 | 01/09/1942 | 40 days | General | Boiler number D1757 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/12/1944 | 26/01/1945 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 2225 (Diagram 56) |
||
Gateshead Works | 05/05/1946 | 17/05/1946 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/10/1947 | 12/12/1947 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 2911 (Diagram 56B) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1903 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1218 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 19 03 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
07/10/1919 | Modification | Diagram 56 number D989 boiler fitted | ||
26/06/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1922. Dep: 20/09/1922. | ||
21/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1925. Dep: 09/12/1925. | ||
19/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1928. Dep: 07/02/1929. | ||
29/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1932. Dep: 05/08/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D737 (Diagram 56) |
||
10/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/02/1936. Dep: 23/03/1936. | ||
11/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1937. Dep: 17/04/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2073 (Diagram 56) |
||
27/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/04/1937. Dep: 14/05/1937. | ||
05/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1939. Dep: 31/01/1940. | ||
24/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1942. Dep: 01/09/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1757 (Diagram 56) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
20/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1944. Dep: 26/01/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2225 (Diagram 56) |
||
07/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3289 | ||
05/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/05/1946. Dep: 17/05/1946. | ||
25/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1947. Dep: 12/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2911 (Diagram 56B) |
||
15/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
21/02/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63289 but not taken up | ||
08/1950 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
21/08/1950 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3289 from Middlesbrough (51D) |