|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1912 | 04/1912 | General | |||||
1919 | 07/1919 | General | Boiler number D882 (Diagram 56) |
||||
Darlington Works | 01/04/1924 | 31/05/1924 | 61 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/07/1927 | 11/10/1927 | 103 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/09/1930 | 24/10/1930 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/01/1933 | 23/01/1933 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 19/04/1934 | 15/05/1934 | 27 days | General | Boiler number D1815 (Diagram 56A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/02/1936 | 05/06/1936 | 100 days | General | Boiler number D1670 (Diagram 56A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1939 | 22/03/1939 | 49 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/12/1940 | 19/12/1940 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1941 | 08/11/1941 | 34 days | General | Boiler number D1997 (Diagram 56A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/01/1944 | 03/03/1944 | 47 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 27/06/1945 | 21/07/1945 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/07/1946 | 14/09/1946 | 64 days | General | Boiler number D1674 (Diagram 56A) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/09/1946 | 24/09/1946 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/10/1948 | 05/10/1948 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1902 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1320 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 3 02 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
07/04/1912 | Modification | Diagram 56 number G182 boiler fitted | ||
01/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1924. Dep: 31/05/1924. | ||
01/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1927. Dep: 11/10/1927. | ||
11/09/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1930. Dep: 24/10/1930. | ||
10/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/01/1933. Dep: 23/01/1933. | ||
19/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1934. Dep: 15/05/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1815 (Diagram 56A) |
||
27/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1936. Dep: 05/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1670 (Diagram 56A) |
||
07/11/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
02/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1939. Dep: 22/03/1939. | ||
09/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/12/1940. Dep: 19/12/1940. | ||
06/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1941. Dep: 08/11/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1997 (Diagram 56A) |
||
17/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1944. Dep: 03/03/1944. | ||
27/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/06/1945. Dep: 21/07/1945. | ||
14/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3263 | ||
13/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1946. Dep: 14/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1674 (Diagram 56A) |
||
21/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/09/1946. Dep: 24/09/1946. | ||
05/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 05/10/1948. Dep: 05/10/1948. | ||
01/11/1948 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3263 from Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
12/1948 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63263 but not taken up |