|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1916 | 10/1916 | General | Boiler number D602 (Diagram 56) |
||||
Darlington Works | 03/08/1923 | 18/10/1923 | 77 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 16/11/1923 | 22/12/1923 | 37 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 22/09/1926 | 07/01/1927 | 108 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/10/1929 | 26/11/1929 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/03/1932 | 19/04/1932 | 34 days | General | Boiler number D1769 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/11/1934 | 09/01/1935 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 2085 (Diagram 56) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/10/1936 | 19/11/1936 | 39 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 27/04/1938 | 08/06/1938 | 43 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/08/1941 | 06/10/1941 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/11/1943 | 11/12/1943 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 3135 (Diagram 56B) |
||
Gateshead Works | 17/03/1945 | 05/04/1945 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 25/01/1947 | 22/03/1947 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 2279 (Diagram 56) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1901 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 2117 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 11 01 Allocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) Diagram 56 boiler fitted |
||
1910 | Modification | Diagram 56 number G80 boiler fitted | ||
03/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1923. Dep: 18/10/1923. | ||
16/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/11/1923. Dep: 22/12/1923. | ||
22/09/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1926. Dep: 07/01/1927. | ||
14/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1929. Dep: 26/11/1929. | ||
17/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1932. Dep: 19/04/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1769 (Diagram 56) |
||
21/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1934. Dep: 09/01/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2085 (Diagram 56) |
||
12/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/10/1936. Dep: 19/11/1936. | ||
27/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1938. Dep: 08/06/1938. | ||
22/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1941. Dep: 06/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 56B) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Borough Gardens (BOR) | ||
16/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1943. Dep: 11/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3135 (Diagram 56B) |
||
17/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/03/1945. Dep: 05/04/1945. | ||
15/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3251 | ||
25/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1947. Dep: 22/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2279 (Diagram 56) |
||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 63251 but not taken up | ||
20/12/1950 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3251 from Borough Gardens (54C) | ||
1951 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |