|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1915 | 23/10/1915 | General | Boiler number 869 (Diagram 17Sup) |
|||
Gorton Works | 18/12/1920 | 22/01/1921 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 47 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/02/1923 | 02/06/1923 | 106 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/08/1924 | 01/11/1924 | 78 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5160 |
||
Gorton Works | 16/07/1927 | 22/10/1927 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 836 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/08/1930 | 27/09/1930 | 43 days | General | Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
Gorton Works | 21/05/1932 | 25/06/1932 | 36 days | General | New 21 inch cylinders and piston valves Boiler number 468 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/10/1935 | 26/10/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 874 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/06/1938 | 25/06/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 833 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/03/1941 | 12/04/1941 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3725 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/06/1943 | 03/07/1943 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 903 (Diagram 19A) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/01/1945 | 24/02/1945 | 29 days | Heavy | Boiler number 3736 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/07/1946 | 27/07/1946 | 22 days | Light Repair | Broken L.H. cylinder |
||
Gorton Works | 25/10/1947 | 15/11/1947 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 874 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/08/1948 | 1 day | Light Repair | Tender only |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1909 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 160 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
11/01/1913 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
1915 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: 23/10/1915. Work undertaken: Boiler number 869 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
23/02/1920 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keadby (KEA) | ||
18/12/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1920. Dep: 22/01/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number 47 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
17/02/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1923. Dep: 02/06/1923. | ||
16/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1924. Dep: 01/11/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5160 |
||
16/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1927. Dep: 22/10/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 836 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
01/11/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
16/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1930. Dep: 27/09/1930. Work undertaken: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
21/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1932. Dep: 25/06/1932. Work undertaken: New 21 inch cylinders and piston valves Boiler number 468 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
12/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1935. Dep: 26/10/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 874 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
11/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1938. Dep: 25/06/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 833 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
29/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1941. Dep: 12/04/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3725 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
26/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1943. Dep: 03/07/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 903 (Diagram 19A) |
||
27/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 27/01/1945. Dep: 24/02/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3736 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
20/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3232 | ||
06/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/07/1946. Dep: 27/07/1946. Work undertaken: Broken L.H. cylinder |
||
25/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1947. Dep: 15/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 874 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
07/08/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 63232 | ||
07/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/08/1948. Work undertaken: Tender only |
||
05/06/1950 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63232 from Ardsley (37A) |