|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1911 | 23/09/1911 | General | Boiler number 865 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1915 | 25/09/1915 | General | Boiler number 858 (Diagram 17Sup) |
|||
Gorton Works | 15/04/1922 | 25/11/1922 | 225 days | General | Boiler number 1412 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1924 | 03/05/1924 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6139 |
||
Gorton Works | 17/04/1926 | 10/07/1926 | 85 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 19/11/1927 | 28/01/1928 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 896 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/01/1930 | 15/02/1930 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 419 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/12/1931 | 31/12/1931 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 1920 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/08/1934 | 15/09/1934 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1701 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/08/1936 | 29/08/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3724 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/01/1937 | 30/01/1937 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 28/08/1937 | 04/09/1937 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 10/12/1938 | 24/12/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 849 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/05/1940 | 15/06/1940 | 22 days | General | New R.H. cylinder Boiler number 836 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/10/1942 | 1 day | Rebuilding | Tender sent to Gorton 1/1/43. |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 09/04/1945 | 10/04/1945 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/10/1945 | 1 day | Unclassified | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 19/02/1946 | 23/03/1946 | 33 days | Heavy | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9927 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 18/06/1948 | 15/07/1948 | 28 days | General | Renumbered to BR 69927 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 22/07/1948 | 26/07/1948 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/09/1948 | 18/09/1948 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/12/1951 | 26/01/1952 | 54 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/09/1952 | 25/09/1952 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
18/08/1954 | 31/08/1954 | 14 days | Light Casual | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 13/10/1954 | 21/10/1954 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/12/1954 | 26/12/1954 | 19 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
19/06/1948 | Cowlairs Works (Stripping Pit) | Locomotives in the yard awaiting repair were Nos. 502, 1745, 2436/39, 4532, 4600, 4791, 5237, 5913, 8118, 8350, 8955, 9178, 9503/11, 61002 an 61735-the last two being lettered B.R. Locomotives in the Works were: Stripping Pit Nos. 1102, 9927; Erecting Shop Nos. 1116, 1774/75/77/92/94, 1885, 1916/95, 2686/90, 4524/50/60/89, 4821, 7492, 8567, 9126/45, 61767; Steaming Pits Nos. 1787, 4925, 61134, 61292, 69206; Paint Shop Nos. 1101, 1783. 61292 is fitted with ex L.M.S. tablet catcher and is to be used on Perth-Inverness trials. | SLS/194808 |
22/08/1948 | Eastfleld MPD | Class 'Q.1' NO,. 9927 has been re-numbered 69927 and lettered British Railways, but retains the L.N.E.R. totem on the bunker. Another engine of this Class, No. 9925, has been fitted with slip-coupling apparatus since early July and was used on the Cowlairs Bank during the Glasgow Fair Holiday. No. 61103 (THJ) was noted here painted black and fully lined on 28/8 being ex Cowlairs W/E 28/8; a smokebox numberplate had been fitted | SLS/194810 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1907 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1139 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4482 Allocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
1911 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1911. Dep: 23/09/1911. Work undertaken: Boiler number 865 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1915 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: 25/09/1915. Work undertaken: Boiler number 858 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
15/04/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1922. Dep: 25/11/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1412 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
23/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1924. Dep: 03/05/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6139 |
||
17/04/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1926. Dep: 10/07/1926. | ||
19/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1927. Dep: 28/01/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 896 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
12/1928 | Modification | Modification: Modified to conform to LNER Gauge | ||
25/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1930. Dep: 15/02/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 419 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
19/12/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1931. Dep: 31/12/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1920 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
18/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1934. Dep: 15/09/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1701 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
15/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1936. Dep: 29/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3724 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
09/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/01/1937. Dep: 30/01/1937. | ||
28/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/08/1937. Dep: 04/09/1937. | ||
10/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1938. Dep: 24/12/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 849 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
25/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1940. Dep: 15/06/1940. Work undertaken: New R.H. cylinder Boiler number 836 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
27/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 27/10/1942. Work undertaken: Tender sent to Gorton 1/1/43. |
||
26/12/1942 | Modification | Diagram 17A number 22998 boiler fitted | ||
26/12/1942 | Modification | Diagram 17A number 3740 boiler fitted | ||
31/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
21/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
26/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
09/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/04/1945. Dep: 10/04/1945. | ||
26/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/10/1945. | ||
19/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 19/02/1946. Dep: 23/03/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9927 |
||
18/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1948. Dep: 15/07/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 69927 |
||
22/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/07/1948. Dep: 26/07/1948. | ||
14/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/09/1948. Dep: 18/09/1948. | ||
04/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1951. Dep: 26/01/1952. | ||
22/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/09/1952. Dep: 25/09/1952. | ||
13/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/10/1954. Dep: 21/10/1954. | ||
08/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/12/1954. Dep: 26/12/1954. | ||
18/04/1956 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69927 from Eastfield (65A) |