|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1910 | 14/05/1910 | General | Boiler number 867 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1916 | 07/10/1916 | General | Returned to UK 10/5/19 Boiler number 1646 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 28/06/1919 | 02/08/1919 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 19/02/1921 | 19/03/1921 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/04/1923 | 10/11/1923 | 197 days | General | Boiler number 201 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/03/1926 | 24/04/1926 | 50 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6075 |
||
Gorton Works | 17/11/1928 | 16/02/1929 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 442 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/11/1931 | 05/12/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 19 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/01/1935 | 02/02/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 431 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1937 | 02/10/1937 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 530 (Diagram 17Sat) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1905 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1075 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4337 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: 14/05/1910. Work undertaken: Boiler number 867 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
14/12/1912 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1916. Dep: 07/10/1916. Work undertaken: Returned to UK 10/5/19 Boiler number 1646 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
28/06/1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1919. Dep: 02/08/1919. | ||
19/02/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1921. Dep: 19/03/1921. | ||
28/04/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1923. Dep: 10/11/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 201 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
15/12/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
26/03/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
06/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1926. Dep: 24/04/1926. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6075 |
||
17/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1928. Dep: 16/02/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 442 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
05/03/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
14/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1931. Dep: 05/12/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 19 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
19/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1935. Dep: 02/02/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 431 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
04/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1937. Dep: 02/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 530 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
06/01/1940 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 6075 from Ardsley (ARD) |