|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1907 | 02/02/1907 | General | Boiler number 335 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1908 | 15/08/1908 | General | Boiler number 336 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1910 | 06/08/1910 | General | Boiler number 1266 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1913 | 28/06/1913 | General | Boiler number 839 (Diagram 17Sat) |
|||
Gorton Works | 1915 | 15/05/1915 | General | Boiler number 1376 (Diagram 17Sup) |
|||
Gorton Works | 12/06/1920 | 24/07/1920 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1371 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/04/1922 | 24/06/1922 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 31/01/1925 | 28/03/1925 | 57 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5087 |
||
Gorton Works | 11/12/1926 | 28/05/1927 | 169 days | General | Boiler number 1829 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/11/1929 | 30/11/1929 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 01/10/1932 | 15/10/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1646 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/11/1935 | 30/11/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1829 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/07/1937 | 28/08/1937 | 29 days | Heavy | New R.H. cylinder |
||
Gorton Works | 16/09/1939 | 30/09/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 838 (Diagram 17Sat) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
Gorton Works | 04/08/1941 | 09/08/1941 | 6 days | Heavy | Boiler number 897 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/03/1944 | 1 day | Rebuilding | Tender to Gorton 14/4/44. |
|||
Darlington Works | 14/08/1946 | 19/09/1946 | 37 days | Light Repair | Side tank fractured |
||
Darlington Works | 26/04/1948 | 11/06/1948 | 47 days | General | Renumbered to BR 69933 |
||
Darlington Works | 15/12/1948 | 14/01/1949 | 31 days | Light Casual | Left hand tank fractured |
||
Gorton Works | 13/11/1951 | 11/01/1952 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 22987 (Diagram 17A) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/07/1955 | 02/09/1955 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 22994 (Diagram 17A) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/09/1957 | 26/10/1957 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 19/08/1958 | 20/09/1958 | 33 days | Light Casual | Not repaired |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' Nos. 9000-9015 are to be renumbered 67701-67716. No. 67717 (9016) is the first to come out under this number, while No. 9015 was altered to 67716. The paint dates of Nos. 9009-9012 are March, and Nos. 9013-9015 and 67717-67718 are April. The Works' Nos. are 2028-2036/48 respectively. The next order for North Road will be a batch of 'A.1' 'Pacifics.' The rumour of further 'B.1's' came about owing to Stooperdale building a batch of spare boilers for this class. Locomotives for shops or scrap during the period April 4th-May 2nd included:-Nos. 1440, E1461, 2391, 2747, 3037, 3170, 3286, 3315, 5069, 5625, 5768/88, 7306, 7649/88, 9837/52, 9917/33, 77414, 79198. The following locomotives have arrived for cutting-up:-ex G.E. Nos. 5380/83, 5400, 7120/37, 8212, ex MET Nos. 7511/12 and ex M.G.N. No. 8485. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 5778, 9856, 60510, 60825, 61011/60/71, 61420, 62388, 63125/40, 65624/50, 65825/47/51, 67263, 67301, 67632/84, 67718, 68248/90, 68724, 69786, 69875, 69910. The following locomotives have been painted or repainted green: Nos. 61011/60/71 an 67684. No. 60510 came off Works without nameplates, but returned and has at last had these fitted-Robert the Bruce. | SLS/194806 |
31/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. | SLS/194902 |
28/02/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). | SLS/194904 |
21/08/1954 | Q1 on passenger train! | On Saturday 21/8/54 the unusual event occurred of a Q1 0-8-0T hauling a passenger train, albeit for a short distance. On this date B16/1 61470 (50B) failed with a blown middle cylinder cover between Gascoigne Woad and Hagg Lane whilst working the 9.45 a.m. passenger train from Leeds City to Hull. 69933 (50C), one of the Gascoigne Wood hump pilots, was requisitioned to haul the disabled engine and train into Selby, where 61470 was removed by 69933 to the shed and the train worked forward by J39 64947 (50F). | SLS/195410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1903 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 87 Built at Kitson, Works Number 4214 Allocated to Barnsley (BRN) Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted |
||
1907 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1907. Dep: 02/02/1907. Work undertaken: Boiler number 335 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1908 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1908. Dep: 15/08/1908. Work undertaken: Boiler number 336 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1910. Dep: 06/08/1910. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1266 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1913 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1913. Dep: 28/06/1913. Work undertaken: Boiler number 839 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
1915 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1915. Dep: 15/05/1915. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1376 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
12/06/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1920. Dep: 24/07/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1371 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
29/04/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1922. Dep: 24/06/1922. | ||
31/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1925. Dep: 28/03/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5087 |
||
11/12/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1926. Dep: 28/05/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1829 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
02/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1929. Dep: 30/11/1929. | ||
01/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1932. Dep: 15/10/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1646 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
16/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1935. Dep: 30/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1829 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
31/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 31/07/1937. Dep: 28/08/1937. Work undertaken: New R.H. cylinder |
||
16/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1939. Dep: 30/09/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 838 (Diagram 17Sat) Modified to conform to LNER Gauge |
||
04/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 04/08/1941. Dep: 09/08/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 897 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
14/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Rebuilding) - Arr: 14/03/1944. Work undertaken: Tender to Gorton 14/4/44. |
||
20/05/1944 | Modification | Diagram 17Sup number 643 boiler fitted | ||
26/06/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
19/07/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
17/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
13/12/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 3211 but not taken up | ||
30/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9933 | ||
14/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/08/1946. Dep: 19/09/1946. Work undertaken: Side tank fractured |
||
26/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1948. Dep: 11/06/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 69933 |
||
15/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/12/1948. Dep: 14/01/1949. Work undertaken: Left hand tank fractured |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Selby (SEL) | ||
13/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1951. Dep: 11/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22987 (Diagram 17A) |
||
05/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1955. Dep: 02/09/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22994 (Diagram 17A) |
||
30/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/09/1957. Dep: 26/10/1957. | ||
19/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/08/1958. Dep: 20/09/1958. Work undertaken: Not repaired |
||
11/12/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69933 from Selby (50C) |