Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 566 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 13972 Week
» 66988 Month
» 186515 Year
» 3213368 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1234 |
m/e |
11/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8234 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5584 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
65584 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J17 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
T67 |
To Service |
During 11/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 02/02/1960 |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 3 mths , 2 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
31D |
South Lynn |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
01/11/1958 |
ALLOC |
31C |
Kings Lynn |
4w/e |
28/11/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/02/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1234 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8234 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5584 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - March (MAR) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65584 |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
12/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to South Lynn (31D) |
|
|
15/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
21/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
02/02/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65584 |
|
|