|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 07/1924 | 31/05/1924 | Heavy | ||||
Gorton Works | 06/05/1927 | 16/06/1927 | 42 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 09/03/1929 | 23/07/1929 | 137 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/4 Boiler number 982 (Diagram 2) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/08/1931 | 22/09/1931 | 34 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 29/01/1934 | 07/04/1934 | 69 days | General | Boiler number 7506 (Diagram 2) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/02/1936 | 18/04/1936 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/06/1938 | 24/09/1938 | 90 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 09/05/1940 | 22/06/1940 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 8459 (Diagram 2) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/01/1943 | 20/02/1943 | 38 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/10/1944 | 11/11/1944 | 35 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/03/1946 | 13/04/1946 | 28 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3882 |
||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1947 | 12/08/1947 | 87 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 5029 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1949 | 14/01/1950 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 5017 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63882 |
||
Gorton Works | 17/01/1950 | 19/01/1950 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 19/09/1951 | 20/09/1951 | 2 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 28/04/1952 | 24/05/1952 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28381 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/05/1952 | 28/05/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 10/02/1955 | 17/03/1955 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28382 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/12/1958 | 14/01/1959 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 28891 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/01/1962 | 21/02/1962 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2121 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22211 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
06/1920 | Allocation | |||
06/1920 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2978 | ||
29/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
31/05/1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 6287 | ||
31/05/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
07/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: ?/07/1924. Dep: 31/05/1924. | ||
06/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1927. Dep: 16/06/1927. | ||
09/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1929. Dep: 23/07/1929. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/4 Boiler number 982 (Diagram 2) |
||
20/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1931. Dep: 22/09/1931. | ||
29/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1934. Dep: 07/04/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7506 (Diagram 2) |
||
29/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/02/1936. Dep: 18/04/1936. | ||
27/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1938. Dep: 24/09/1938. | ||
09/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1940. Dep: 22/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8459 (Diagram 2) |
||
26/10/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D) | ||
02/12/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
14/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1943. Dep: 20/02/1943. | ||
08/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1944. Dep: 11/11/1944. | ||
10/12/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
17/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1946. Dep: 13/04/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3882 |
||
18/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1947. Dep: 12/08/1947. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 5029 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1949. Dep: 14/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5017 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63882 |
||
17/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/01/1950. Dep: 19/01/1950. | ||
19/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/09/1951. Dep: 20/09/1951. | ||
28/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1952. Dep: 24/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28381 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/05/1952. Dep: 28/05/1952. | ||
10/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1955. Dep: 17/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28382 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1958. Dep: 14/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28891 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/01/1962. Dep: 21/02/1962. | ||
16/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
23/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
01/03/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
23/05/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63882 from Langwith Junction (41J) |