|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 05/09/1925 | 05/12/1925 | 92 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6527 |
||
Gorton Works | 27/02/1926 | 06/03/1926 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 04/02/1928 | 17/03/1928 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1089 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/01/1930 | 01/02/1930 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1414 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/06/1932 | 25/06/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1342 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/06/1935 | 29/06/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1299 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/09/1937 | 02/10/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1297 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/10/1939 | 11/11/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 828 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/10/1941 | 18/10/1941 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 861 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 791 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2098 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22188 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2856 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
05/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1925. Dep: 05/12/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6527 |
||
05/12/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
05/12/1925 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
27/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/02/1926. Dep: 06/03/1926. | ||
1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
04/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1928. Dep: 17/03/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1089 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/03/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
11/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1930. Dep: 01/02/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1414 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/08/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
27/09/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
25/10/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
11/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1932. Dep: 25/06/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1342 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1935. Dep: 29/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1299 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/12/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
18/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1937. Dep: 02/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1297 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1939. Dep: 11/11/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 828 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1941. Dep: 18/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 861 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 791 |
||
18/10/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 791 from March (MAR) |