|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 22/12/1923 | 02/01/1924 | 12 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to GCR 1292c |
||
Gorton Works | 16/06/1924 | 28/08/1924 | 74 days | General | Boiler number 1483 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6292 |
||
Gorton Works | 27/04/1927 | 13/06/1927 | 48 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 12/08/1929 | 22/10/1929 | 72 days | General | Boiler number 1145 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/08/1931 | 15/09/1931 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 1473 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/01/1934 | 24/02/1934 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 1126 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/12/1935 | 01/02/1936 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3231 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/05/1938 | 16/07/1938 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 3256 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/08/1940 | 17/08/1940 | 10 days | General | Boiler number 811 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/07/1942 | 15/08/1942 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/09/1942 | 04/09/1942 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 06/09/1942 | 14/09/1942 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 14/04/1944 | 27/05/1944 | 44 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 5015 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/10/1945 | 03/11/1945 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 15/09/1946 | 23/11/1946 | 70 days | General | Boiler number 5028 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/12/1948 | 29/01/1949 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 5023 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63853 |
||
Gorton Works | 06/09/1950 | 21/10/1950 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 28268 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/11/1952 | 02/01/1953 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28389 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/03/1955 | 14/04/1955 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 28385 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/10/1957 | 30/11/1957 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28395 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/01/1959 | 20/02/1959 | 24 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 25/05/1959 | 03/06/1959 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 30/12/1959 | 05/02/1960 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2055 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22146 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2851 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
22/12/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/12/1923. Dep: 02/01/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to GCR 1292c |
||
02/01/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
02/01/1924 | To Stock | To GCR stock | ||
16/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1924. Dep: 28/08/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1483 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6292 |
||
27/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1927. Dep: 13/06/1927. | ||
12/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1929. Dep: 22/10/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1145 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1931. Dep: 15/09/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1473 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1934. Dep: 24/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1126 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1935. Dep: 01/02/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3231 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
29/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1938. Dep: 16/07/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3256 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1940. Dep: 17/08/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 811 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/10/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D) | ||
04/12/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
14/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1942. Dep: 15/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/09/1942. Dep: 04/09/1942. | ||
06/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/09/1942. Dep: 14/09/1942. | ||
14/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1944. Dep: 27/05/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 5015 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/12/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
19/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/10/1945. Dep: 03/11/1945. | ||
11/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3853 | ||
15/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1946. Dep: 23/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5028 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
12/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
19/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1948. Dep: 29/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5023 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63853 |
||
06/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1950. Dep: 21/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28268 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
28/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1952. Dep: 02/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28389 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
11/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1955. Dep: 14/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28385 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1957. Dep: 30/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28395 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
28/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/01/1959. Dep: 20/02/1959. | ||
25/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/05/1959. Dep: 03/06/1959. | ||
30/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/12/1959. Dep: 05/02/1960. | ||
26/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63853 from Langwith Junction (41J) |