|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 29/10/1927 | 11/02/1928 | 106 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6615 |
||
Darlington Works | 18/08/1930 | 14/10/1930 | 58 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 24/06/1933 | 08/07/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1244 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/12/1935 | 18/01/1936 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3227 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/05/1938 | 04/06/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3332 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/04/1940 | 13/04/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3235 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/04/1943 | 01/05/1943 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 3351 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/03/1945 | 31/03/1945 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1280 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/11/1946 | 14/12/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3271 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3849 |
||
Gorton Works | 16/10/1948 | 06/11/1948 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3251 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/01/1952 | 16/02/1952 | 22 days | General | Converted to oil fuel Boiler number 22242 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2048 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22141 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
29/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1927. Dep: 11/02/1928. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6615 |
||
11/02/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
11/02/1928 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
18/11/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
18/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1930. Dep: 14/10/1930. | ||
24/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1933. Dep: 08/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1244 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/07/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
21/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1935. Dep: 18/01/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3227 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
02/08/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD) | ||
29/04/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
21/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1938. Dep: 04/06/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3332 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1940. Dep: 13/04/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3235 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/05/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
20/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1943. Dep: 01/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3351 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
10/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1945. Dep: 31/03/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1280 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1946. Dep: 14/12/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3271 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3849 |
||
16/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1948. Dep: 06/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3251 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/11/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 63849 | ||
11/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
16/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD) | ||
22/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD) | ||
12/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Royston (20C) | ||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
26/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1952. Dep: 16/02/1952. Work undertaken: Converted to oil fuel Boiler number 22242 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/02/1952 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 041 from Colwick (38A) | ||
22/02/1952 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 041 |