|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 15/01/1921 | 23/03/1921 | 68 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/06/1923 | 21/09/1923 | 84 days | General | Boiler number 1746 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1926 | 20/05/1926 | 87 days | General | Boiler number 1117 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5008 |
||
Gorton Works | 06/08/1928 | 11/10/1928 | 67 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/05/1930 | 15/07/1930 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 1073 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/04/1932 | 18/06/1932 | 60 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/5 Boiler number 615 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/10/1935 | 15/11/1935 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 639 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/07/1937 | 31/07/1937 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 1084 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/09/1939 | 04/11/1939 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 621 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/10/1941 | 06/12/1941 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 615 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/06/1942 | 15/08/1942 | 47 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 12/02/1944 | 11/03/1944 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 639 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/07/1946 | 31/08/1946 | 52 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/06/1948 | 03/07/1948 | 32 days | Heavy | Boiler number 22342 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63628 |
||
Gorton Works | 14/08/1951 | 22/09/1951 | 40 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/07/1952 | 04/10/1952 | 90 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 1955 | 12/02/1955 | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28831 (Diagram 15) |
|||
Gorton Works | 02/09/1958 | 11/10/1958 | 40 days | General |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2007 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
15/06/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8 | ||
15/01/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1921. Dep: 23/03/1921. | ||
16/06/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
30/06/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1923. Dep: 21/09/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1746 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
23/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1926. Dep: 20/05/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1117 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5008 |
||
06/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1928. Dep: 11/10/1928. | ||
16/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1930. Dep: 15/07/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1073 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1932. Dep: 18/06/1932. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/5 Boiler number 615 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/10/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
02/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1935. Dep: 15/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 639 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
07/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1937. Dep: 31/07/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1084 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1939. Dep: 04/11/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 621 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1941. Dep: 06/12/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 615 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/06/1942. Dep: 15/08/1942. | ||
03/09/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
12/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1944. Dep: 11/03/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 639 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
18/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
12/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
29/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
11/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1946. Dep: 31/08/1946. | ||
24/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3628 | ||
02/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 02/06/1948. Dep: 03/07/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22342 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63628 |
||
14/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1951. Dep: 22/09/1951. | ||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
23/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
29/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
07/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/07/1952. Dep: 04/10/1952. | ||
1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1955. Dep: 12/02/1955. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28831 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/01/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
02/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1958. Dep: 11/10/1958. | ||
03/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
05/09/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63628 from Frodingham (36C) |