|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 19/02/1921 | 24/07/1921 | 156 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 20/01/1923 | 14/04/1923 | 85 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/06/1925 | 26/08/1925 | 86 days | General | Boiler number 1749 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5001 |
||
Gorton Works | 10/02/1928 | 10/04/1928 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 1298 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1930 | 22/04/1930 | 60 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 25/01/1932 | 26/02/1932 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 856 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/02/1936 | 18/03/1936 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 1328 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/05/1938 | 23/07/1938 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 3338 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/08/1940 | 14/09/1940 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 868 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/05/1943 | 12/06/1943 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3260 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1945 | 09/02/1946 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 3300 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1948 | 31/05/1948 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1236 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63626 |
||
Gorton Works | 11/08/1950 | 16/09/1950 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 22106 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/09/1952 | 18/10/1952 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 22299 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/02/1955 | 19/03/1955 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 22247 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/10/1956 | 15/12/1956 | 65 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 05/03/1958 | 26/04/1958 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 22185 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/05/1961 | 29/05/1961 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2005 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
15/06/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1 | ||
19/02/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1921. Dep: 24/07/1921. | ||
05/08/1921 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
20/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1923. Dep: 14/04/1923. | ||
31/01/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
02/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1925. Dep: 26/08/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1749 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5001 |
||
10/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1928. Dep: 10/04/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1298 (Diagram 15) |
||
1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
22/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1930. Dep: 22/04/1930. | ||
25/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1932. Dep: 26/02/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 856 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/11/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
08/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1936. Dep: 18/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1328 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
23/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1938. Dep: 23/07/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3338 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/12/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
18/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1940. Dep: 14/09/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 868 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/05/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
21/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
29/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1943. Dep: 12/06/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3260 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/09/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
06/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1945. Dep: 09/02/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3300 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
01/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3626 | ||
12/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1948. Dep: 31/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1236 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63626 |
||
11/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1950. Dep: 16/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22106 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1952. Dep: 18/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22299 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1955. Dep: 19/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22247 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/10/1956. Dep: 15/12/1956. | ||
05/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1958. Dep: 26/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22185 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 29/05/1961. Dep: 29/05/1961. | ||
22/06/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63626 from Frodingham (36C) |