|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 04/04/1925 | 20/06/1925 | 78 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6531 |
||
Gorton Works | 17/09/1927 | 29/10/1927 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/11/1929 | 14/12/1929 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1864 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/10/1931 | 14/11/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 813 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/06/1934 | 30/06/1934 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1146 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/08/1936 | 05/09/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1837 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/10/1938 | 12/11/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3351 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/01/1941 | 11/01/1941 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3350 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/05/1943 | 22/05/1943 | 9 days | General | Boiler number 1039 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/09/1945 | 13/10/1945 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1968 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/02/1948 | 20/03/1948 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1081 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63833 |
||
Gorton Works | 20/01/1951 | 03/02/1951 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22161 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/02/1951 | 19/02/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 14/03/1953 | 04/04/1953 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22108 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/04/1953 | 08/04/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 06/08/1955 | 27/08/1955 | 22 days | General | Briquette tube feeder Boiler number 22144 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/05/1958 | 14/06/1958 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 22237 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/01/1962 | 13/01/1962 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1971 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22029 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
04/04/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1925. Dep: 20/06/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6531 |
||
19/06/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
20/06/1925 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
11/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
17/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1927. Dep: 29/10/1927. | ||
23/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1929. Dep: 14/12/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1864 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1931. Dep: 14/11/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 813 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1934. Dep: 30/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1146 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1936. Dep: 05/09/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1837 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1938. Dep: 12/11/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3351 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1941. Dep: 11/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3350 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1943. Dep: 22/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1039 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
29/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1945. Dep: 13/10/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1968 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
09/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3833 | ||
28/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1948. Dep: 20/03/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1081 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63833 |
||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
20/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1951. Dep: 03/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22161 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/02/1951. Dep: 19/02/1951. | ||
14/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1953. Dep: 04/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22108 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/04/1953. Dep: 08/04/1953. | ||
06/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1955. Dep: 27/08/1955. Work undertaken: Briquette tube feeder Boiler number 22144 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1958. Dep: 14/06/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22237 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 13/01/1962. Dep: 13/01/1962. | ||
19/01/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63833 from Langwith Junction (41J) |