|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 16/02/1924 | 08/03/1924 | 22 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6265 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/06/1924 | 20/09/1924 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 1225 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/10/1926 | 31/12/1926 | 63 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/02/1929 | 16/03/1929 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/12/1930 | 17/01/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1773 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/05/1933 | 13/05/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1283 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/07/1935 | 27/07/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1874 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/10/1937 | 06/11/1937 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 819 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/05/1940 | 11/05/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3396 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/02/1943 | 06/03/1943 | 15 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 06/01/1945 | 03/02/1945 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3411 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/03/1947 | 22/03/1947 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3328 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/01/1949 | 29/01/1949 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3233 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63812 |
||
Gorton Works | 14/04/1951 | 05/05/1951 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22183 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/06/1953 | 11/07/1953 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22171 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/10/1955 | 19/11/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22175 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1923 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21900 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
16/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/02/1924. Dep: 08/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6265 |
||
08/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
08/03/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
28/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1924. Dep: 20/09/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1225 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1926. Dep: 31/12/1926. | ||
16/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1929. Dep: 16/03/1929. | ||
27/12/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1930. Dep: 17/01/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1773 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1933. Dep: 13/05/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1283 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1935. Dep: 27/07/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1874 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1937. Dep: 06/11/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 819 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1940. Dep: 11/05/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3396 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/11/1940 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
30/01/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
20/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1943. Dep: 06/03/1943. | ||
08/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
06/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1945. Dep: 03/02/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3411 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
16/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3812 | ||
01/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1947. Dep: 22/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3328 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1949. Dep: 29/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3233 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63812 |
||
14/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1951. Dep: 05/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22183 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/09/1951 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
23/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
29/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
27/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1953. Dep: 11/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22171 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1955. Dep: 19/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22175 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/01/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
08/05/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63812 from Mexborough (41F) |