|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 04/04/1925 | 04/07/1925 | 92 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6506 |
||
Gorton Works | 09/10/1926 | 20/11/1926 | 43 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1928 | 05/01/1929 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 1457 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/01/1931 | 14/02/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1328 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/10/1933 | 14/10/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1023 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/04/1936 | 09/05/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1053 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/10/1938 | 29/10/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1264 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/02/1939 | 11/03/1939 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1941 | 15/03/1941 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1881 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/07/1942 | 08/08/1942 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 3301 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/08/1944 | 02/09/1944 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1095 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/12/1946 | 25/01/1947 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3293 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/05/1949 | 28/05/1949 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3278 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63782 |
||
Gorton Works | 19/06/1949 | 20/06/1949 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 20/10/1951 | 10/11/1951 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22224 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/11/1953 | 28/11/1953 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22198 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/01/1956 | 11/02/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22116 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/09/1958 | 25/10/1958 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22265 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/05/1961 | 16/05/1961 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1879 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21856 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
04/04/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1925. Dep: 04/07/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6506 |
||
02/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
04/07/1925 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
10/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
09/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/10/1926. Dep: 20/11/1926. | ||
08/12/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
13/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1928. Dep: 05/01/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1457 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/03/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
15/08/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
27/09/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
31/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1931. Dep: 14/02/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1328 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/10/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
07/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1933. Dep: 14/10/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1023 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1936. Dep: 09/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1053 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
01/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1938. Dep: 29/10/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1264 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/02/1939. Dep: 11/03/1939. | ||
08/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1941. Dep: 15/03/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1881 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
24/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1942. Dep: 08/08/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3301 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1944. Dep: 02/09/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1095 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3782 | ||
28/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1946. Dep: 25/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3293 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1949. Dep: 28/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3278 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63782 |
||
19/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/06/1949. Dep: 20/06/1949. | ||
20/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1951. Dep: 10/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22224 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1953. Dep: 28/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22198 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1956. Dep: 11/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22116 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1958. Dep: 25/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22265 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 16/05/1961. Dep: 16/05/1961. | ||
25/05/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63782 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |