|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 29/12/1923 | 19/01/1924 | 22 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to GCR 1282c |
||
Gorton Works | 22/11/1924 | 07/02/1925 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1336 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6282 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/10/1927 | 12/11/1927 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 25/01/1930 | 15/02/1930 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1863 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/01/1932 | 06/02/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1461 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/05/1934 | 09/06/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1445 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/05/1936 | 30/05/1936 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3241 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/07/1938 | 16/07/1938 | 15 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 19/10/1940 | 26/10/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1131 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 08/01/1943 | 13/02/1943 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 3310 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/12/1944 | 06/01/1945 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3206 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/06/1947 | 26/07/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3279 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/07/1948 | 28/08/1948 | 40 days | Heavy | Renumbered to BR 63759 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/03/1949 | 02/04/1949 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1235 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/11/1951 | 17/11/1951 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22227 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/11/1951 | 30/11/1951 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 05/12/1953 | 19/12/1953 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22206 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/12/1953 | 20/12/1953 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 03/07/1955 | 08/07/1955 | 6 days | Light Casual | Tender changed |
||
Gorton Works | 04/08/1956 | 08/09/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22895 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/08/1959 | 26/09/1959 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1917 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1848 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21825 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
29/12/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/12/1923. Dep: 19/01/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to GCR 1282c |
||
19/01/1924 | To Stock | To GCR stock | ||
01/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
31/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
22/11/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1924. Dep: 07/02/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1336 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6282 |
||
08/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1927. Dep: 12/11/1927. | ||
25/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1930. Dep: 15/02/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1863 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1932. Dep: 06/02/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1461 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/03/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
26/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1934. Dep: 09/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1445 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1936. Dep: 30/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3241 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
02/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1938. Dep: 16/07/1938. | ||
19/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1940. Dep: 26/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1131 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1943. Dep: 13/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3310 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1944. Dep: 06/01/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3206 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3759 | ||
21/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1947. Dep: 26/07/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3279 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
20/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 20/07/1948. Dep: 28/08/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63759 |
||
23/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
26/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
12/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1949. Dep: 02/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1235 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1951. Dep: 17/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22227 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/11/1951. Dep: 30/11/1951. | ||
05/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1953. Dep: 19/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22206 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/12/1953. Dep: 20/12/1953. | ||
03/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/07/1955. Dep: 08/07/1955. Work undertaken: Tender changed |
||
24/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
04/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1956. Dep: 08/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22895 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/08/1959. Dep: 26/09/1959. Work undertaken: Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
||
23/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63759 from Immingham (40B) |