|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 26/04/1924 | 12/07/1924 | 78 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6337 |
||
Gorton Works | 01/05/1926 | 24/07/1926 | 85 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 11/08/1928 | 24/11/1928 | 106 days | General | Boiler number 1882 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/07/1930 | 09/08/1930 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1106 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1932 | 09/07/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1414 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/06/1934 | 16/06/1934 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1053 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/03/1936 | 21/03/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1941 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/08/1938 | 17/09/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3252 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1941 | 12/04/1941 | 22 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3678 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/03/1942 | 28/03/1942 | 13 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 01/05/1943 | 15/05/1943 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3659 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/10/1944 | 04/11/1944 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3669 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/04/1946 | 04/05/1946 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 17/05/1947 | 21/06/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3687 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/05/1949 | 28/05/1949 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22313 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63699 |
||
Gorton Works | 06/01/1951 | 27/01/1951 | 22 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 05/07/1952 | 02/08/1952 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22337 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/08/1952 | 08/08/1952 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 18/04/1953 | 25/04/1953 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 05/06/1954 | 12/06/1954 | 8 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 22322 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/04/1955 | 21/05/1955 | 29 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 20/10/1956 | 01/12/1956 | 43 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 22324 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/05/1957 | 08/06/1957 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1958 | 03/05/1958 | 43 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 22336 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/05/1959 | 26/05/1959 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1682 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3726 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
06/1920 | Allocation | |||
06/1920 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2973 | ||
26/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1924. Dep: 12/07/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6337 |
||
08/07/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
12/07/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
01/05/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1926. Dep: 24/07/1926. | ||
11/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1928. Dep: 24/11/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1882 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1930. Dep: 09/08/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1106 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1932. Dep: 09/07/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1414 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1934. Dep: 16/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1053 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1936. Dep: 21/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1941 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1938. Dep: 17/09/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3252 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1941. Dep: 12/04/1941. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3678 (Diagram 15D) |
||
16/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/03/1942. Dep: 28/03/1942. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
01/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1943. Dep: 15/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3659 (Diagram 15D) |
||
14/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1944. Dep: 04/11/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3669 (Diagram 15D) |
||
25/02/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
27/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/04/1946. Dep: 04/05/1946. | ||
15/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3699 | ||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
17/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1947. Dep: 21/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3687 (Diagram 15D) |
||
12/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
14/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1949. Dep: 28/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22313 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63699 |
||
08/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
06/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1951. Dep: 27/01/1951. | ||
30/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
06/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
04/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
10/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
05/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1952. Dep: 02/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22337 (Diagram 15D) |
||
05/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/08/1952. Dep: 08/08/1952. | ||
18/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/04/1953. Dep: 25/04/1953. | ||
05/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 05/06/1954. Dep: 12/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22322 (Diagram 15D) |
||
23/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 23/04/1955. Dep: 21/05/1955. | ||
20/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 20/10/1956. Dep: 01/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22324 (Diagram 15D) |
||
22/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/05/1957. Dep: 08/06/1957. | ||
22/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/03/1958. Dep: 03/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22336 (Diagram 15D) |
||
26/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 26/05/1959. Dep: 26/05/1959. | ||
08/06/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63699 from Colwick (40E) |